Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4457 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/15/2024

                    Act No. 215 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
November 22, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
November 22, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: February 13, 2024 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Reps. Scott, Brenda Carter, Young, Tyrone Carter, Grant, Weiss, Hoskins, O’Neal, 
McKinney, Dievendorf, Edwards, Wilson, Brixie, Stone, Arbit, Morse, Glanville, Price, Brabec, 
Coffia, Hill, Hood, Churches, Snyder, Liberati, Coleman, Hope, Breen, Paiz, Morga n, Miller, 
Byrnes, Haadsma, Steckloff, Andrews, Tsernoglou, Rogers, Conlin, Martus, Puri, Zorn, Kunse, 
Mentzer, Rheingans, Farhat, Wegela, McFall, Shannon, Meerman, Koleszar and Aiyash 
 
ENROLLED HOUSE BILL No. 4457 
AN ACT to designate June 19 of each year as Juneteenth. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
Sec. 1. (1) The legislature recognizes that slavery existed in American history for more than 200 years. Millions 
of African-Americans were brought to the Americas as slaves stacked in the bottom of slave ships in a 5- to 
12-week journey across the Atlantic Ocean known as the “Middle Passage”. Although approximately 
11,500,000 African-Americans survived the voyage across the ocean, the number of those who died in the inhuman 
conditions of the passage is probably even higher. Once in the United States, the slaves were subjected to 
whipping, castration, branding, and rape. The legislature further observes that President Abraham Lincoln’s 
Emancipation Proclamation was issued on January 1, 1863 and declared that all slaves in Confederate-controlled 
areas were free. In the following months, spontaneous celebrations erupted throughout the United States as 
African-Americans learned of their freedom. News of the Emancipation Proclamation reached the states at 
different times, and it was not until June 19, 1865 that the message of freedom reached the state of Texas. In 
honor of this great moment in United States history, the legislature declares that June 19 of each year shall be 
known as “Juneteenth”. 
(2) The legislature encourages each individual in this state to pause on Juneteenth and reflect on the strong 
survival instinct of the African-American slaves and the excitement and great joy with which African-Americans 
first celebrated the emancipation from slavery. It is a reminder to all Americans of the status and importance of 
Americans of African descent as American citizens. 
 
 
(174)   
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
Enacting section 1. This act does not take effect unless House Bill No. 4722 of the 102nd Legislature is enacted 
into law. 
 
 
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: House Bill No. 4722, referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of State 
November 22, 2023, and became 2023 PA 216, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2