Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5143 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/14/2024

                    Act No. 264 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
November 30, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
December 1, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: February 13, 2024 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Reps. Bierlein, Rheingans, Price, Conlin, Schuette, Hope, Rogers, Martus, Brixie, 
Puri, Scott, Andrews, McFall, Brabec, Morse, Haadsma, Wilson, Dievendorf, Morgan, Hood, 
Byrnes, Steckloff, Tyrone Carter, MacDonell, Hoskins, Brenda Carter, O’Neal, Neeley, 
Shannon and Farhat 
 
ENROLLED HOUSE BILL No. 5143 
AN ACT to amend 1976 PA 388, entitled “An act to regulate political activity; to regulate campaign financing; 
to restrict campaign contributions and expenditures; to require campaign statements and reports; to regulate 
anonymous contributions; to regulate campaign advertising and literature; to provide for segregated funds for 
political purposes; to provide for the use of public funds for political purposes; to create certain funds; to provide 
for reversion, retention, or refunding of unexpended balances in certain funds; to require other statements and 
reports; to regulate acceptance of certain gifts, payments, and reimbursements; to prescribe the powers and duties 
of certain state departments and state and local officials and employees; to provide appropriations; to prescribe 
penalties and provide remedies; and to repeal certain acts and parts of acts,” by amending section 2 
(MCL 169.202), as amended by 2001 PA 250. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
Sec. 2. (1) “Artificial intelligence” means a machine-based system that can, for a given set of human-defined 
objectives, make predictions, recommendations, or decisions influencing real or virtual environments, and that 
uses machine and human-based inputs to do all of the following: 
(a) Perceive real and virtual environments. 
(b) Abstract such perceptions into models through analysis in an automated manner. 
(c) Use model inference to formulate options for information or action. 
(2) “Award” means a plaque, trophy, certificate, bust, ceremonial gavel, or memento. 
(3) “Ballot question” means a question that is submitted or is intended to be submitted to a popular vote at an 
election whether or not it qualifies for the ballot. 
(4) “Ballot question committee” means a committee acting in support of, or in opposition to, the qualification, 
passage, or defeat of a ballot question but that does not receive contributions or make expenditures or 
contributions for the purpose of influencing or attempting to influence the action of the voters for or against the 
nomination or election of a candidate. 
(5) “Bundle” means for a bundling committee to deliver 1 or more contributions from individuals to the 
candidate committee of a candidate for statewide elective office, without the money becoming money of the 
bundling committee. 
 
 
 
(176)   
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
(6) “Bundling committee” means an independent committee or political committee that makes an expenditure 
to solicit or collect from individuals contributions that are to be part of a bundled contribution, which expenditure 
is required to be reported as an in-kind expenditure for a candidate for statewide elective office. 
(7) “Business” means a corporation, limited liability company, partnership, sole proprietorship, firm, 
enterprise, franchise, association, organization, self-employed individual, holding company, joint stock company, 
receivership, trust, activity, or entity that is organized for profit or nonprofit purposes. 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless House Bill No. 5141 of the 102nd Legislature 
is enacted into law. 
 
 
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: House Bill No. 5141, referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of State 
December 1, 2023, and became 2023 PA 263, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2