Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5145 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/14/2024

                    Act No. 266 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
November 30, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
December 1, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: February 13, 2024 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Reps. Arbit, Rheingans, Price, Conlin, Puri, Paiz, Hope, Martus, Brixie, Bierlein, 
Rogers, Scott, Andrews, McFall, Brabec, Morse, Wilson, Dievendorf, Morgan, Hood and 
Byrnes 
 
ENROLLED HOUSE BILL No. 5145 
AN ACT to amend 1927 PA 175, entitled “An act to revise, consolidate, and codify the laws relating to criminal 
procedure and to define the jurisdiction, powers, and duties of courts, judges, and other officers of the court under 
the provisions of this act; to provide laws relative to the rights of persons accused of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for the arrest of persons charged with or suspected of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for bail of persons arrested for or accused of criminal offenses and ordinance 
violations; to provide for the examination of persons accused of criminal offenses; to regulate the procedure 
relative to grand juries, indictments, informations, and proceedings before trial; to provide for trials of persons 
complained of or indicted for criminal offenses and ordinance violations and to provide for the procedure in those 
trials; to provide for judgments and sentences of persons convicted of criminal offenses and ordinance violations; 
to establish a sentencing commission and to prescribe its powers and duties; to provide for procedure relating to 
new trials and appeals in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to provide a uniform system of probation 
throughout this state and the appointment of probation officers; to prescribe the powers, duties, and compensation 
of probation officers; to provide penalties for the violation of the duties of probation officers; to provide for 
procedure governing proceedings to prevent crime and proceedings for the discovery of crime; to provide for fees 
of officers, witnesses, and others in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to set forth miscellaneous provisions 
as to criminal procedure in certain cases; to provide penalties for the violation of certain provisions of this act; 
and to repeal all acts and parts of acts inconsistent with or contravening any of the provisions of this act,” by 
amending section 11d of chapter XVII (MCL 777.11d), as amended by 2023 PA 83. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
CHAPTER XVII 
 
Sec. 11d. This chapter applies to the following felonies enumerated in chapter 168 of the Michigan Compiled 
Laws: 
M.C.L. Category Class Description 	Stat Max 
168.303(6) Pub trst E Signing a nominating petition with multiple names 5 
168.482e(3) Pub trst E Signing a petition with multiple names 	5 
 
 
(178)   
168.544c(10) Pub trst E Signing a nominating petition with multiple names 5 
168.590h(6) Pub trst E Signing a qualifying petition with multiple names 5 
168.685(11) Pub trst E Signing a petition to form a new political party with 
multiple names 
5 
168.720j(14) Pub trst E Disclosing an election result from an early voting site 
before election day 
5 
168.731(4) Pub trst G Election law – filing certain false statements 	2 
168.734 Pub trst G Election law – election board refusing to provide 
challenger conveniences 
2 
168.756 Pub trst E Elector’s false statement concerning inability to mark 
ballot 
5 
168.757 Pub trst E Election inspector – unlawful conduct 	5 
168.759(13) Pub trst E Forged signature on absentee ballot 	5 
168.759b Pub trst E False statement in application for emergency absentee 
ballot 
5 
168.761(5) Pub trst E Assisting an absentee voter in making a false statement 5 
168.765a(9) Pub trst E Disclosing how ballot voted or election results early before 
polls are closed 
5 
168.769(4) Pub trst E Voting both in person and by absentee ballot 	5 
168.808 Pub trst E Untrue statement by member of board of inspectors 4 
168.873 Pub trst E Misconduct of election employee in recount – county and 
local 
5 
168.887 Pub trst E Misconduct of election employee in recount 	5 
168.931b Person E Intimidating an election official or preventing an election 
official from performing the election official’s duties – 
third or subsequent offense 
5 
168.932(a) Pub trst E Bribing or intimidating voters 	5 
168.932(b) Pub trst E Ballot tampering 	5 
168.932(c) Pub trst E Destroying or falsifying election return or records 5 
168.932(d) Pub trst E Disclosing votes or obstructing voter 	5 
168.932(e) Pub trst E Absentee ballot tampering 	5 
168.932(f) Pub trst E Election law – possess absent voter ballot delivered to 
another person 
5 
168.932(g) Pub trst E Suggesting how a disabled voter should vote 	5 
168.932(h) Pub trst E Suggesting or influencing how an absentee voter should 
vote 
5 
168.932(i) Pub trst E Organizing a meeting where absentee voter ballots are to 
be voted 
5 
168.932a Pub trst G Election offenses 	4 
168.932c Pub trst E Providing compensation to a person for registering 
individuals to vote 
5 
168.932e Pub trst E Person intentionally misrepresenting that the person is 
an election official in a polling place 
5 
168.932f Pub trst E Distributing or agreeing to distribute materially deceptive 
media – certain subsequent offense 
5 
168.936 Pub trst E Election law – perjury 	5 
168.937 Pub trst E Election law – forgery 	5 
168.954(4) Pub trst E Signing a recall petition with multiple names 	5 
 
 
 
 
 
2   
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 
102nd Legislature are enacted into law: 
(a) House Bill No. 4129. 
(b) House Bill No. 5144. 
 
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note:  House Bill No. 4129, referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of 
State December 1, 2023, and became 2023 PA 253, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024.  
 
House Bill No. 5144, also referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of State 
December 1, 2023, and became 2023 PA 265, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
3