Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB6075 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/12/2024

                    HOUSE BILL NO. 6075  A bill to amend 2012 PA 615, entitled "Michigan energy assistance act," by amending section 3 (MCL 400.1233). the people of the state of michigan enact: Sec. 3. (1) Subject to state appropriations, not later than October 1, 2013, the department shall establish and administer the Michigan energy assistance program statewide to provide energy assistance to eligible low-income households. (2) The department may use funds received from a federal energy assistance program and any funds collected or appropriated to fund the program. The department shall distribute the funds described in this subsection for energy assistance and may use a portion of the funds for necessary administrative expenses. Necessary administrative expenses shall must be calculated using an established cost allocation methodology. (3) Energy assistance must prioritize vulnerable populations and, as appropriate for the household, include services that will enable participants to become or move toward becoming self-sufficient. , including assisting Services that assist participants in becoming self-sufficient include, but are not limited to, providing assistance to help participants in paying their energy bills on time, assisting participants in budgeting for and contributing to their ability to provide for energy expenses, and assisting participants in utilizing energy services to optimize on energy efficiency. referral to weatherization or energy waste reduction programs and services. By October 1, 2014, each entity that carries out a contract with the department under this section shall provide or coordinate these services. The department shall attempt to coordinate its efforts with the efforts of other state departments or agencies to assist low-income households in becoming or moving toward becoming self-sufficient and reducing energy insecurity. (4) The department shall develop a simplified, single application for all applicants to use to apply for energy assistance under the program. The single application shall must be made available to all entities that contract with the department to provide services under the program.  (5) Not later than December 1, 2014, and annually after that, thereafter, the department shall provide a report to the legislature, the senate and house appropriations subcommittees on the department budget, the senate and house committees on issues relating to energy, and the senate and house fiscal agencies on how money from the program created in this act was distributed. Beginning with the program year that begins October 1, 2025, the annual report required under this subsection must be filed no later than March 1, 2027. (6) The department shall notify participants that they are eligible for other services under the program including, but not limited to, energy waste reduction products and services offered by an energy provider or a home weatherization assistance program.  Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 102nd Legislature are enacted into law: (a) Senate Bill No. 353. (b) Senate Bill No. 880. (c) Senate Bill No. 881. 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

HOUSE BILL NO. 6075



A bill to amend 2012 PA 615, entitled

"Michigan energy assistance act,"

by amending section 3 (MCL 400.1233).

the people of the state of michigan enact:

Sec. 3. (1) Subject to state appropriations, not later than October 1, 2013, the department shall establish and administer the Michigan energy assistance program statewide to provide energy assistance to eligible low-income households.

(2) The department may use funds received from a federal energy assistance program and any funds collected or appropriated to fund the program. The department shall distribute the funds described in this subsection for energy assistance and may use a portion of the funds for necessary administrative expenses. Necessary administrative expenses shall must be calculated using an established cost allocation methodology.

(3) Energy assistance must prioritize vulnerable populations and, as appropriate for the household, include services that will enable participants to become or move toward becoming self-sufficient. , including assisting Services that assist participants in becoming self-sufficient include, but are not limited to, providing assistance to help participants in paying their energy bills on time, assisting participants in budgeting for and contributing to their ability to provide for energy expenses, and assisting participants in utilizing energy services to optimize on energy efficiency. referral to weatherization or energy waste reduction programs and services. By October 1, 2014, each entity that carries out a contract with the department under this section shall provide or coordinate these services. The department shall attempt to coordinate its efforts with the efforts of other state departments or agencies to assist low-income households in becoming or moving toward becoming self-sufficient and reducing energy insecurity.

(4) The department shall develop a simplified, single application for all applicants to use to apply for energy assistance under the program. The single application shall must be made available to all entities that contract with the department to provide services under the program. 

(5) Not later than December 1, 2014, and annually after that, thereafter, the department shall provide a report to the legislature, the senate and house appropriations subcommittees on the department budget, the senate and house committees on issues relating to energy, and the senate and house fiscal agencies on how money from the program created in this act was distributed. Beginning with the program year that begins October 1, 2025, the annual report required under this subsection must be filed no later than March 1, 2027.

(6) The department shall notify participants that they are eligible for other services under the program including, but not limited to, energy waste reduction products and services offered by an energy provider or a home weatherization assistance program. 

Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 102nd Legislature are enacted into law:

(a) Senate Bill No. 353.

(b) Senate Bill No. 880.

(c) Senate Bill No. 881.