Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HCR0015 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/25/2024

                    house concurrent resolution no.15 Rep. Aiyash offered the following concurrent resolution: A concurrent resolution prescribing the legislative schedule. Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, September 26, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, October 15, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, October 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, October 16, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, October 16, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, October 17, 2024, at 12:00 noon; when it adjourns on Thursday, October 17, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, November 7, 2024, at 12:00 noon; and be it further  Resolved, That when the Senate adjourns on Wednesday, October, 2, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, October 8, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. 

 

 

house concurrent resolution no.15

Rep. Aiyash offered the following concurrent resolution:

A concurrent resolution prescribing the legislative schedule.

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, September 26, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, October 15, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, October 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, October 16, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, October 16, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, October 17, 2024, at 12:00 noon; when it adjourns on Thursday, October 17, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, November 7, 2024, at 12:00 noon; and be it further 

Resolved, That when the Senate adjourns on Wednesday, October, 2, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, October 8, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.