Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0068 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 07/17/2023

                    Act No. 59 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
July 11, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
July 12, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 10, 2023 
 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Senators Geiss, Lauwers, Chang, Bellino, Bayer, Shink, Wojno, McCann, 
Cavanagh and Polehanki 
 
ENROLLED SENATE BILL No. 68 
AN ACT to amend 1927 PA 175, entitled β€œAn act to revise, consolidate, and codify the laws relating to criminal 
procedure and to define the jurisdiction, powers, and duties of courts, judges, and other officers of the court under 
the provisions of this act; to provide laws relative to the rights of persons accused of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for the arrest of persons charged with or suspected of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for bail of persons arrested for or accused of criminal offenses and ordinance 
violations; to provide for the examination of persons accused of criminal offenses; to regulate the procedure 
relative to grand juries, indictments, informations, and proceedings before trial; to provide for trials of persons 
complained of or indicted for criminal offenses and ordinance violations and to provide for the procedure in those 
trials; to provide for judgments and sentences of persons convicted of criminal offenses and ordinance violations; 
to establish a sentencing commission and to prescribe its powers and duties; to provide for procedure relating to 
new trials and appeals in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to provide a uniform system of probation 
throughout this state and the appointment of probation officers; to prescribe the powers, duties, and compensation 
of probation officers; to provide penalties for the violation of the duties of probation officers; to provide for 
procedure governing proceedings to prevent crime and proceedings for the discovery of crime; to provide for fees 
of officers, witnesses, and others in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to set forth miscellaneous provisions 
as to criminal procedure in certain cases; to provide penalties for the violation of certain provisions of this act; 
and to repeal all acts and parts of acts inconsistent with or contravening any of the provisions of this act,” by 
amending section 16d of chapter XVII (MCL 777.16d), as amended by 2016 PA 88. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
CHAPTER XVII 
 
Sec. 16d. This chapter applies to the following felonies enumerated in chapter 750 of the Michigan Compiled 
Laws: 
M.C.L. 	Category Class Description 	Stat Max 
750.81(5) 	Person E Domestic assault or assault of a 
pregnant individual with prior 
convictions 
5 
750.81a(3) 	Person E Aggravated domestic assault with 
prior convictions 
5 
 
 
 
(27)  750.81d(1) 	Person G Assaulting, resisting, or obstructing 
certain persons 
2 
750.81d(2) 	Person F Assaulting, resisting, or obstructing 
certain persons causing bodily injury 
requiring medical attention 
4 
750.81d(3) 	Person C Assaulting, resisting, or obstructing 
certain persons causing serious 
impairment 
15 
750.81d(4) 	Person B Assaulting, resisting, or obstructing 
certain persons causing death 
20 
750.81e(2) 	Person G Assault on utility worker causing 
bodily injury requiring medical 
attention 
2 
750.81e(3) 	Person E Assault on utility worker causing 
serious impairment of a body function 
5 
750.82(1) 	Person F Felonious assault 	4 
750.82(2) 	Person F Felonious assault β€” weapon-free 
school zone 
4 
750.83 	Person A Assault with intent to murder Life 
750.84(1)(a) 	Person D Assault with intent to do great bodily 
harm less than murder 
10 
750.84(1)(b) 	Person D Assault by strangulation or 
suffocation 
10 
750.85 	Person A Torture 	Life 
750.86 	Person D Assault with intent to maim 	10 
750.87 	Person D Assault with intent to commit a 
felony 
10 
750.88 	Person C Assault with intent to commit 
unarmed robbery 
15 
750.89 	Person A Assault with intent to commit armed 
robbery 
Life 
750.90(1) 	Person C Sexual contact under pretext of 
medical treatment 
20 
750.90(2) 	Person B Sexual penetration under pretext of 
medical treatment 
25 
750.90a 	Person A Assault against a pregnant individual 
causing miscarriage, stillbirth, or 
death to embryo or fetus with intent 
or recklessness 
Life 
750.90b(a) 	Person C Assault against a pregnant individual 
resulting in miscarriage, stillbirth, or 
death to embryo or fetus 
15 
750.90b(b) 	Person D Assault against a pregnant individual 
resulting in great bodily harm to 
embryo or fetus 
10 
750.90c(a) 	Person C Gross negligence against a pregnant 
individual resulting in miscarriage, 
stillbirth, or death to embryo or fetus 
15 
750.90c(b) 	Person E Gross negligence against a pregnant 
individual resulting in great bodily 
harm to embryo or fetus 
5 
750.90d(a) 	Person C Operating a vehicle under the 
influence or while impaired causing 
miscarriage, stillbirth, or death to 
embryo or fetus 
15 
2  750.90d(b) 	Person E Operating a vehicle under the 
influence or while impaired causing 
serious or aggravated injury to 
embryo or fetus 
5 
750.90e 	Person G Careless or reckless driving causing 
miscarriage, stillbirth, or death to 
embryo or fetus 
2 
750.90g(3) 	Person A Performance of procedure on live 
infant with intent to cause death 
Life 
750.90h 	Person G Performing or assisting in 
performance of partial-birth abortion 
2 
750.91 	Person A Attempted murder 	Life 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act takes effect 90 days after the date it is enacted into law. 
 
Enacting section 2. This amendatory act does not take effect unless Senate Bill No. 67 of the 102nd Legislature 
is enacted into law. 
 
This act is ordered to take immediate effect. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: Senate Bill No. 67, referred to in enacting section 2, was filed with the Secretary of State July 12, 
2023, and became 2023 PA 58, Eff. Oct. 10, 2023. 
 
 
 
3 
 
 
 
Secretary of the Senate