Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0072 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 07/17/2023

                    Act No. 63 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
July 11, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
July 12, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 10, 2023 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Senators McDonald Rivet, Geiss, Chang, Lauwers, Bellino, Bayer, Shink, Wojno, 
McCann, Cavanagh and Polehanki 
 
ENROLLED SENATE BILL No. 72 
AN ACT to amend 1927 PA 175, entitled “An act to revise, consolidate, and codify the laws relating to criminal 
procedure and to define the jurisdiction, powers, and duties of courts, judges, and other officers of the court under 
the provisions of this act; to provide laws relative to the rights of persons accused of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for the arrest of persons charged with or suspected of criminal offenses and 
ordinance violations; to provide for bail of persons arrested for or accused of criminal offenses and ordinance 
violations; to provide for the examination of persons accused of criminal offenses; to regulate the procedure 
relative to grand juries, indictments, informations, and proceedings before trial; to provide for trials of persons 
complained of or indicted for criminal offenses and ordinance violations and to provide for the procedure in those 
trials; to provide for judgments and sentences of persons convicted of criminal offenses and ordinance violations; 
to establish a sentencing commission and to prescribe its powers and duties; to provide for procedure relating to 
new trials and appeals in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to provide a uniform system of probation 
throughout this state and the appointment of probation officers; to prescribe the powers, duties, and compensation 
of probation officers; to provide penalties for the violation of the duties of probation officers; to provide for 
procedure governing proceedings to prevent crime and proceedings for the discovery of crime; to provide for fees 
of officers, witnesses, and others in criminal and ordinance violation cases; to set forth miscellaneous provisions 
as to criminal procedure in certain cases; to provide penalties for the violation of certain provisions of this act; 
and to repeal all acts and parts of acts inconsistent with or contravening any of the provisions of this act,” by 
amending section 13n of chapter XVII (MCL 777.13n), as amended by 2018 PA 583. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
CHAPTER XVII 
 
Sec. 13n. This chapter applies to the following felonies enumerated in chapter 333 of the Michigan Compiled 
Laws: 
M.C.L. 	Category Class Description 	Stat Max 
333.10116(1) 	Pub ord E Purchasing or selling body part of 
deceased individual for 
transplantation or therapy 
5 
333.10117 	Pub ord E Falsifying, concealing, or defacing 
document of anatomical gift for 
financial gain 
5 
 
 
(31)  333.10204(1) 	Pub ord F Transferring a human organ for 
valuable consideration 
4 
333.10204(4) 	Pub saf F Removal of a human organ by an 
unauthorized individual 
4 
333.10205 	Pub saf F Removal of a human organ in an 
unapproved facility 
4 
333.13738(2) 	Pub saf F Waste disposal violations — 
subsequent offense 
5 
333.13738(3) 	Pub saf F Improper disposal of waste with 
indifference to human life 
2 
 	Pub saf B Improper disposal of waste with 
extreme indifference to human life 
20 
333.16170(3) 	Pub trst F False representation of completion of 
health professional recovery program 
4 
333.16213a(3) Pub trst G Medical record – intentional omission 
of certain medical services – health 
professional 
2 
333.16279(5)(a) Person G Performing certain medical treatment 
on a minor – first offense 
2 
333.16279(5)(b) Person E Performing certain medical treatment 
on a minor – subsequent offense 
5 
333.16294 	Pub saf F Unauthorized practice of health 
profession 
4 
333.17748d(2) Person G Compounding pharmacy violation 2 
333.17748d(3) Person F Compounding pharmacy violation 
resulting in personal injury 
4 
333.17748d(4) Person E Compounding pharmacy violation 
resulting in serious impairment of a 
body function 
5 
333.17748d(5) Person C Compounding pharmacy violation 
resulting in death 
15 
333.17764(3) 	Pub saf G Adulterating, misbranding, removing, 
or substituting a drug or device 
2 
333.17764(4) 	Pub saf F Adulterating, misbranding, removing, 
or substituting a drug or device 
resulting in personal injury 
4 
333.17764(5) 	Pub saf E Adulterating, misbranding, removing, 
or substituting a drug or device 
resulting in serious impairment of a 
body function 
5 
333.17764(6) 	Pub saf C Adulterating, misbranding, removing, 
or substituting a drug or device 
resulting in death 
15 
333.17766c(2)(b) CS 	G Possessing more than 12 grams 
ephedrine or pseudoephedrine 
2 
333.17766c(2)(c) CS 	E Purchasing or possessing ephedrine 
or pseudoephedrine knowing or 
having reason to know that it is to be 
used to manufacture 
methamphetamine 
5 
333.20142(5) 	Pub trst F False statement in application for 
licensure as health facility 
4 
333.20153 	Pub saf D Reuse of single-use medical device 10 
 
2   
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
333.20175b(3) Pub trst G Medical record – intentional omission 
of certain medical services – health 
facility or agency 
2 
333.21792 	Pub trst G Nursing home accepting referral fees, 
bribing officials, or accepting bribes 
4 
333.26424(l) 	Pub trst G Selling marihuana in violation of 
registry identification card 
restrictions 
2 
333.27407a(c) Pub saf F Operating medical marihuana facility 
without a license resulting in death 
or serious injury 
4 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act takes effect 90 days after the date it is enacted into law. 
 
Enacting section 2. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 
102nd Legislature are enacted into law: 
(a) Senate Bill No. 69. 
(b) Senate Bill No. 71. 
 
This act is ordered to take immediate effect. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: Senate Bill No. 69, referred to in enacting section 2, was filed with the Secretary of State July 12, 
2023, and became 2023 PA 60, Eff. Oct. 10, 2023. 
 
Senate Bill No. 71, also referred to in enacting section 2, was filed with the Secretary of State July 12, 2023, and 
became 2023 PA 62, Eff. Oct. 10, 2023. 
 
 
3