Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0590 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/06/2024

                    Act No. 255 
Public Acts of 2023 
Approved by the Governor 
November 30, 2023 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
December 1, 2023 
EFFECTIVE DATE: February 13, 2024 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2023 
Introduced by Senator Cavanagh 
 
ENROLLED SENATE BILL No. 590 
AN ACT to amend 1954 PA 116, entitled “An act to reorganize, consolidate, and add to the election laws; to 
provide for election officials and prescribe their powers and duties; to prescribe the powers and duties of certain 
state departments, state agencies, and state and local officials and employees; to provide for the nomination and 
election of candidates for public office; to provide for the resignation, removal, and recall of certain public officers; 
to provide for the filling of vacancies in public office; to provide for and regulate primaries and elections; to provide 
for the purity of elections; to guard against the abuse of the elective franchise; to define violations of this act; to 
provide appropriations; to prescribe penalties and provide remedies; and to repeal certain acts and all other acts 
inconsistent with this act,” by amending section 13 (MCL 168.13) and by adding section 845a. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
Sec. 13. (1) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, and except as otherwise provided 
under subsection (2), anything required by this act to be done by a day certain, if that day falls on a Saturday, 
Sunday or legal holiday, may be done within the same time limits on the next secular day. 
(2) This section does not apply to either of the following: 
(a) The final day for applying for an absent voter ballot. 
(b) Any deadline provided for under section 845a. 
 
Sec. 845a. (1) A candidate listed on the ballot for the office of President or Vice President of the United States 
who is aggrieved by an error in the certification or determination of the results of a presidential election by the 
board of state canvassers may seek judicial review of the certification or determination by a complaint for 
mandamus filed in the supreme court as provided in this section. A candidate is aggrieved for purposes of this 
subsection only if, but for the error, the candidate would have received the largest number of votes eligible to be 
counted in the presidential election. 
(2) The supreme court has original and exclusive jurisdiction to consider a complaint for mandamus under 
subsection (1). A complaint for mandamus under subsection (1) must be filed with the supreme court within 
48 hours after the certification or determination of the results of a presidential election and must name the board 
of state canvassers as a defendant. The governor, the attorney general, the secretary of state, and the candidate 
certified or determined by the board of state canvassers to be the winner of the presidential election may intervene 
in a proceeding described under subsection (1). To have conclusive effect on the determination of electors 
appointed by this state, the supreme court’s final order in a proceeding described under subsection (1) must be 
issued not later than the day before the date that the electors for President and Vice President of the United States 
convene under section 47. 
 
 
 
(134)   
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
(3) A proceeding described under subsection (1) must not delay any of the following: 
(a) The board of state canvassers certifying or determining the results of a presidential election as required 
under this act. 
(b) The governor issuing or transmitting a certificate of ascertainment under section 46. 
(c) A recount as provided under chapter XXXIII. 
(4) A party in a proceeding described under subsection (1) shall not seek preliminary relief. 
(5) A proceeding described under subsection (1) is not an election audit under this act. 
(6) A proceeding described under subsection (1) is the exclusive means of seeking judicial relief from the 
certification or determination of the results of a presidential election. 
(7) As used in this section, “presidential election” means the statewide general November election in 2024, and 
the statewide general November election every 4 years after 2024, that is determined solely by the vote of electors 
casting ballots in the election for a candidate for President and Vice President of the United States, including the 
election of electors of President and Vice President of the United States as provided under chapter IV. 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless all of the following bills of the 
102nd Legislature are enacted into law: 
(a) Senate Bill No. 529. 
(b) Senate Bill No. 591. 
 
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
 
 
 
Compiler's note: Senate Bill No. 529, referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of 
State December 1, 2023, and became 2023 PA 269, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024.  
 
Senate Bill No. 591, also referred to in enacting section 1, was filed with the Secretary of State December 
1, 2023, and became 2023 PA 256, Eff. Feb. 13, 2024. 
 
 
2