Michigan 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0799 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 12/10/2024

                    Act No. 114 
Public Acts of 2024 
Approved by the Governor 
July 23, 2024 
Filed with the Secretary of State 
July 23, 2024 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sine Die 
(91st day after final adjournment of the 2024 Regular Session) 
 
 
 
 
STATE OF MICHIGAN 
102ND LEGISLATURE 
REGULAR SESSION OF 2024 
Introduced by Senator Klinefelt 
 
ENROLLED SENATE BILL No. 799 
AN ACT to amend 2008 PA 23, entitled “An act to authorize the secretary of state to issue enhanced driver 
licenses and state personal identification cards to United States citizens who reside in Michigan to facilitate travel 
between the United States and Canada; to establish certain funds and prescribe duties for certain officials; and 
to prohibit certain conduct and prescribe penalties,” by amending section 4 (MCL 28.304), as amended by 2021 
PA 72. 
 
The People of the State of Michigan enact: 
 
Sec. 4. (1) The secretary of state may issue an enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal 
identification card to an applicant who provides satisfactory proof of the applicant’s full legal name, United States 
citizenship, identity, date of birth, Social Security number, residence address, and a photographic identity 
document. Beginning June 27, 2021, if the applicant is a program participant in the address confidentiality 
program under the address confidentiality program act, 2020 PA 301, MCL 780.851 to 780.873, the applicant 
shall present to the secretary of state the applicant’s participation card issued under the address confidentiality 
program act, 2020 PA 301, MCL 780.851 to 780.873. An applicant may choose to apply for a standard driver 
license or standard official state personal identification card or an enhanced driver license or enhanced official 
state personal identification card. 
(2) An enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card must include reasonable 
security measures to protect against unauthorized disclosure of personal information regarding residents of this 
state that is contained in the enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card. 
(3) An enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card may include radio 
frequency identification technology that is limited to a randomly assigned number that must be encrypted if 
agreed to by the United States Department of Homeland Security, and does not include biometric data. The 
secretary of state shall ensure that the radio frequency identification technology is secure from unauthorized data 
access and includes reasonable security measures to protect against unauthorized disclosure of personal 
information. An applicant must sign a declaration acknowledging the applicant’s understanding of the radio 
frequency identification technology before the applicant is issued an enhanced driver license or enhanced official 
state personal identification card. 
(4) An enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card that expires on or after 
March 1, 2020 is considered valid until March 31, 2021. An enhanced driver license or enhanced official state 
personal identification card that expires after March 31, 2021 but before August 1, 2021 is valid until 120 days 
after the date of the expiration. 
(5) The requirements of this act are in addition to the requirements otherwise imposed on individuals who 
apply for a standard driver license or standard official state personal identification card. 
 
 
 
(33)   
 
 
Secretary of the Senate 
(6) The holder of an enhanced driver license issued under this act is subject to every licensing sanction provided 
under the Michigan vehicle code, 1949 PA 300, MCL 257.1 to 257.923. As used in this subsection, “licensing 
sanction” means the restriction, suspension, revocation, or denial of a driver license; the addition of points to a 
driving record; the assessment of a civil fine or criminal penalty resulting from a conviction; a civil infraction 
determination; the imposition of probationary terms and conditions; or any other penalty provided under the 
Michigan vehicle code, 1949 PA 300, MCL 257.1 to 257.923. 
(7) Beginning June 27, 2021, upon receipt of a notice from the department of the attorney general that an 
individual who has been issued an enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card 
under this act has been certified as a program participant in the address confidentiality program, the secretary 
of state shall issue a corrected enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card to 
that individual by mailing the license or card to the individual’s designated address. Beginning June 27, 2021, an 
enhanced driver license or enhanced official state personal identification card issued under this subsection or 
subsection (1) to a program participant must display the individual’s designated address and must not display 
the individual’s residence address. The requirements of this subsection are in addition to the requirements for 
individuals who are issued a corrected standard driver license under section 310f of the Michigan vehicle code, 
1949 PA 300, MCL 257.310f, or a corrected official state personal identification card under section 2a of 1972 
PA 222, MCL 28.292a. 
(8) As used in this section: 
(a) “Address confidentiality program” means a program as that term is defined in section 3 of the address 
confidentiality program act, 2020 PA 301, MCL 780.853. 
(b) “Designated address” means that term as defined in section 3 of the address confidentiality program act, 
2020 PA 301, MCL 780.853. 
(c) “Program participant” means that term as defined in section 3 of the address confidentiality program act, 
2020 PA 301, MCL 780.853. 
 
Enacting section 1. This amendatory act takes effect 90 days after the date it is enacted into law. 
 
Enacting section 2. This amendatory act does not take effect unless Senate Bill No. 706 of the 102nd Legislature 
is enacted into law. 
 
 
 
Clerk of the House of Representatives 
 
 
 
Approved  
 
 
 
 
Governor 
 
 
Compiler's note: Senate Bill No. 706, referred to in enacting section 2, was filed with the Secretary of State July 23, 
2024, and became 2024 PA 113, Eff. (sine die). 
 
2