Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0038

Introduced
2/15/23  
A resolution to declare February 14, 2023, as National Donor Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0039

Introduced
2/15/23  
A resolution to declare February 16, 2023, as Elks USA Appreciation Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0040

Introduced
2/15/23  
A resolution to declare February 15, 2023, as Less Cancer Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0041

Introduced
2/28/23  
A resolution to declare February 18-25, 2023, as National FFA Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0042

Introduced
2/28/23  
A resolution to declare February 16, 2023, as Conductive Education Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0043

Introduced
2/28/23  
A resolution to declare February 28, 2023, as School-Based Health Care Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0044

Introduced
2/28/23  
A resolution to declare February 28, 2023, as Rare Disease Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0045

Introduced
3/1/23  
A resolution to declare February 27-March 3, 2023, as Public Schools Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0046

Introduced
3/1/23  
A resolution to declare March 2023 as Agriculture Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0047

Introduced
3/1/23  
A resolution to declare March 2023 as Athletic Trainer Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0048

Introduced
3/1/23  
A resolution to declare March 1, 2023, as Endometriosis Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0049

Introduced
3/1/23  
A resolution to honor the courage of the Ukrainian people.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0050

Introduced
3/2/23  
A resolution to declare March 2023 as Brain Injury Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0051

Introduced
3/2/23  
A resolution to declare March 2, 2023, as Cardiovascular Disease Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0052

Introduced
3/2/23  
Refer
3/2/23  
Report Pass
3/7/23  
A resolution to encourage the United States Federal Government to increase transparency and notification standards around the transportation of toxic waste materials across state and community lines.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records