Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0098

Introduced
5/2/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0099

Introduced
5/3/23  
A resolution to declare April 30-May 6, 2023, as Professional Municipal Clerks Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0100

Introduced
5/3/23  
A resolution to declare May 4, 2023, as a Day of Prayer in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0101

Introduced
5/3/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as Jewish American Heritage Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0102

Introduced
5/4/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as Huntington's Disease Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0103

Introduced
5/4/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as Mental Health Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0104

Introduced
5/9/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as National Prisoner Family Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0105

Introduced
5/9/23  
A resolution to declare May 8-12, 2023, as Teacher Appreciation Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0106

Introduced
5/9/23  
A resolution to declare May 2023 as Tennis Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0107

Introduced
5/11/23  
A resolution to declare May 14-20, 2023, as Police Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0108

Introduced
5/11/23  
A resolution to declare May 12, 2023, as Fibromyalgia Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0109

Introduced
5/11/23  
A resolution to declare May 14, 2023, as Hmong American Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0110

Introduced
5/16/23  
A resolution to declare May 14-20, 2023, as Brain Tumor Awareness Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0111

Introduced
5/17/23  
A resolution to declare May 17, 2023, as Older Michiganians Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0112

Introduced
5/18/23  
Refer
5/18/23  
A resolution to urge the Michigan State University Board of Trustees to include a representative from Michigan’s agricultural community on the Presidential Search Committee.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records