Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0113

Introduced
5/23/23  
A resolution to declare May 24, 2023, as National Aviation Maintenance Technician Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0114

Introduced
5/24/23  
A resolution to declare May 25, 2023, as Stop the Bleed Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0115

Introduced
6/6/23  
A resolution to condemn the practice of abortion and to recognize the sanctity of life, prior to birth.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0116

Introduced
6/7/23  
A resolution to declare June 2023 as Dairy Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0117

Introduced
6/7/23  
A resolution to declare June 3-11, 2023, as Great Lakes and Fresh Water Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0118

Introduced
6/7/23  
A resolution to declare June 2023 as Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0119

Introduced
6/8/23  
Refer
6/8/23  
Report Pass
6/13/23  
A resolution to urge the United States Food and Drug Administration to facilitate FDA regulated research on hyperbaric oxygen therapy for the treatment of Traumatic Brain Injury and Post Traumatic Stress Disorder.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0120

Introduced
6/14/23  
A resolution to declare June 17, 2023, as Black Men Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0121

Introduced
6/20/23  
A resolution to declare June 15, 2023, as William DeHart Hubbard Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0122

Introduced
6/22/23  
A resolution to declare June 19-25, 2023, as Pollinators Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0123

Introduced
6/22/23  
A resolution to urge the United States Congress to enact legislation that would ensure abortion is affordable and available for anyone who needs it and to support the President of the United States’ efforts to protect abortion access across the country.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0124

Introduced
6/27/23  
A resolution to declare July 2023 as Cleft and Craniofacial Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0125

Introduced
6/27/23  
A resolution to declare June 27, 2023, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0126

Introduced
6/27/23  
A resolution to declare June 2023 as Aphasia Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0127

Introduced
6/28/23  
A resolution to urge Congress to pass legislation and urge the United States Department of Agriculture to promulgate rules and implement more thorough security measures that would reduce the amount of fraud in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records