Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0263

Introduced
5/21/24  
A resolution to declare May 19-25, 2024, as Emergency Medical Services Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0264

Introduced
5/21/24  
A resolution to declare May 2024 as Brain Tumor Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0265

Introduced
5/22/24  
A resolution to declare May 22, 2024, as Cherry Industry Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0266

Introduced
5/23/24  
A resolution to declare May 20-27, 2024, as Michigan Beach Safety Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0267

Introduced
5/23/24  
A resolution to declare May 23, 2024, as Stop the Bleed Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0268

Introduced
5/23/24  
A resolution to declare May 25, 2024, as Africa Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0269

Introduced
6/4/24  
A resolution to urge the United States Secretary of Homeland Security, in consultation with the United States Secretary of State, to suspend or terminate Chile’s participation in the Visa Waiver Program.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0270

Introduced
6/4/24  
A resolution to oppose illegal immigration and express support for legal immigration.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0271

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 2024 as Dairy Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0272

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 7, 2024, as Gun Violence Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0273

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 1-7, 2024, as CPR and AED Awareness Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0274

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 2024 as Professional Pest Management Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0275

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 15, 2024, as World Elder Abuse Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0276

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution to declare June 11, 2024, as Humanities Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0277

Introduced
6/11/24  
A resolution of tribute offered as a memorial for Paul E. Muxlow, former member of the House of Representatives.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records