Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0278

Introduced
6/12/24  
A resolution to urge the United States Congress to pass legislation temporarily freezing the Adverse Effect Wage Rate for the H-2A Temporary Agricultural Workers Program.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0279

Introduced
6/12/24  
A resolution to declare June 2024 as Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0280

Introduced
6/13/24  
A resolution to express our commitment to strengthening and deepening ties between the state of Michigan and Taiwan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0281

Introduced
6/13/24  
A resolution to declare June 13, 2024, as CVI Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0282

Introduced
6/13/24  
A resolution to declare June 17, 2024, as Black Men Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0283

Introduced
6/18/24  
A resolution to urge the President of the United States to reinstate the Migrant Protection Protocols, also known as the Remain in Mexico program, for processing migrants, including asylum-seekers, attempting to enter the United States from Mexico.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0284

Introduced
6/18/24  
A resolution to declare June 2024 as National Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0285

Introduced
6/18/24  
A resolution to urge the United States Congress to pass the Kidney Patient Access to Technologically Innovative and Essential Nephrology Treatments (PATIENT) Act of 2023.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0286

Introduced
6/20/24  
A resolution to declare June 19, 2024, as Sickle Cell Awareness Day in Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0287

Introduced
6/20/24  
A resolution to declare June 20, 2024, as World Refugee Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0288

Introduced
6/25/24  
A resolution to urge Congress to repeal the William D. Ford Federal Direct Loan Program.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0289

Introduced
6/26/24  
A resolution to declare June 27, 2024, as Public Employee Freedom Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0290

Introduced
6/27/24  
A resolution to declare July 2024 as Cleft and Craniofacial Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0291

Introduced
9/25/24  
No description available.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0292

Introduced
9/25/24  
A resolution of tribute offered as a memorial for Michael Griffin, former member of the House of Representatives.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records