Minnesota 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF156 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/27/2023

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to housing; manufactured homes; amending provisions related to utility​
1.3 billing practices in manufactured home parks; amending Minnesota Statutes 2022,​
1.4 sections 103G.291, subdivision 4; 327C.015, subdivision 17, by adding​
1.5 subdivisions; 327C.04, subdivisions 1, 2, by adding subdivisions; repealing​
1.6 Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, subdivision 4.​
1.7BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.8 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 103G.291, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
1.9 Subd. 4.Demand reduction measures.(a) For the purposes of this section, "demand​
1.10reduction measures" means measures that reduce water demand, water losses, peak water​
1.11demands, and nonessential water uses. Demand reduction measures must include a​
1.12conservation rate structure, or a uniform rate structure with a conservation program that​
1.13achieves demand reduction. A "conservation rate structure" means a rate structure that​
1.14encourages conservation and may include increasing block rates, seasonal rates, time of use​
1.15rates, individualized goal rates, or excess use rates. If a conservation rate is applied to​
1.16multifamily dwellings or a manufactured home park, as defined in section 327C.015,​
1.17subdivision 8, the rate structure must consider each residential unit as an individual user.​
1.18 (b) To encourage conservation, a public water supplier serving more than 1,000 people​
1.19must implement demand reduction measures by January 1, 2015.​
1.20 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective August 1, 2024, and applies to a billing​
1.21period that begins on or after that date.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR	MS	H0156-2​HF156  SECOND ENGROSSMENT​
70​
Printed​
Page No.​State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  156​
NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
Authored by Feist, Norris and Pursell​01/09/2023​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Housing Finance and Policy​
Adoption of Report: Amended and re-referred to the Committee on Commerce Finance and Policy​02/13/2023​
Adoption of Report: Placed on the General Register as Amended​02/27/2023​
Read for the Second Time​ 2.1 Sec. 2. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.015, is amended by adding a subdivision​
2.2to read:​
2.3 Subd. 3a.Commodity rate."Commodity rate" means the per-unit price for utility service​
2.4that varies directly with the volume of a resident's consumption of utility service and that​
2.5is established or approved by the Minnesota Public Utilities Commission or a municipal​
2.6public utilities commission, an electric cooperative association, or a municipality and charged​
2.7to a user of the service.​
2.8 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2.9 Sec. 3. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.015, is amended by adding a subdivision​
2.10to read:​
2.11 Subd. 11a.Public utility."Public utility" has the meaning given in section 216B.02,​
2.12subdivision 4.​
2.13 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2.14 Sec. 4. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.015, subdivision 17, is amended to read:​
2.15 Subd. 17.Substantial modification."Substantial modification" means any change in​
2.16a rule which: (a) significantly diminishes or eliminates any material obligation of the park​
2.17owner; (b) significantly diminishes or eliminates any material right, privilege or freedom​
2.18of action of a resident; or (c) involves a significant new expense for a resident. The​
2.19installation of water meters and the subsequent metering of and billing for water service is​
2.20not a substantial modification of the lease, provided the park owner complies with section​
2.21327C.04, subdivision 6.​
2.22 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective for meter installations initiated on or​
2.23after August 1, 2023.​
2.24 Sec. 5. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.015, is amended by adding a subdivision​
2.25to read:​
2.26 Subd. 17a.Utility provider."Utility provider" means a public utility, an electric​
2.27cooperative association, or a municipal utility.​
2.28 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2​Sec. 5.​
REVISOR	MS	H0156-2​HF156 SECOND ENGROSSMENT​ 3.1 Sec. 6. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, subdivision 1, is amended to read:​
3.2 Subdivision 1.Billing permitted.A park owner who either provides utility service​
3.3directly to residents or who redistributes to residents utility service provided to the park​
3.4owner by a utility provider may charge the residents for that service, only if the charges​
3.5comply with this section.​
3.6 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
3.7 Sec. 7. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, subdivision 2, is amended to read:​
3.8 Subd. 2.Metering required.A park owner who charges residents for a utility service​
3.9must charge each household the same amount, unless the park owner has installed measuring​
3.10devices which accurately meter each household's use of the utility. Utility measuring devices​
3.11installed by the park owner must be installed or repaired only by a licensed plumber, licensed​
3.12electrician, or licensed manufactured home installer.​
3.13 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective August 1, 2023, and applies to meters​
3.14installed or repaired on or after that date.​
3.15 Sec. 8. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, is amended by adding a subdivision to​
3.16read:​
3.17 Subd. 5.Utility charge for metered service.(a) A park owner who redistributes utility​
3.18service may not charge a resident a commodity rate that exceeds the commodity rate at​
3.19which the park owner purchases utility service from a utility provider. Before billing residents​
3.20for redistributed utility service, a park owner must deduct utility service used exclusively​
3.21or primarily for the park owner's purposes.​
3.22 (b) If a utility bill that a park owner receives from a utility provider separates from​
3.23variable consumption charges a fixed service or meter charge or fee, taxes, surcharges, or​
3.24other miscellaneous charges, the park owner must deduct the park owner's pro rata share​
3.25of these separately itemized charges and apportion the remaining fixed portion of the bill​
3.26equally among residents based on the total number of occupied units in the park.​
3.27 (c) A park owner may not charge to or collect from residents any administrative, capital,​
3.28or other expenses associated with the distribution of utility services, including but not limited​
3.29to disconnection, reconnection, and late payment fees.​
3.30 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2023.​
3​Sec. 8.​
REVISOR	MS	H0156-2​HF156 SECOND ENGROSSMENT​ 4.1 Sec. 9. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, is amended by adding a subdivision to​
4.2read:​
4.3 Subd. 6.Rent increases following the installation of water meters.A park owner may​
4.4not increase lot rents for 13 months following the commencement of utility bills for a resident​
4.5whose lease included water service. In each of the three months prior to commencement of​
4.6utility billing, a park owner must provide the resident with a sample bill for water service.​
4.7 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective August 1, 2023, and applies to meter​
4.8installations initiated on or after that date.​
4.9 Sec. 10. REPEALER.​
4.10 Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 327C.04, subdivision 4, is repealed.​
4.11 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2023.​
4​Sec. 10.​
REVISOR	MS	H0156-2​HF156 SECOND ENGROSSMENT​ 327C.04 UTILITY CHARGES.​
Subd. 4.Electricity.If a park owner provides electricity to residents by reselling electricity​
purchased from a public or municipal utility or electrical cooperative, and compliance with​
subdivision 3 would cause the park owner to lose money on the sale of electricity, the park owner​
may bill residents at a rate calculated to allow the park owner to avoid losing money on the sale of​
electricity. In calculating the cost of providing electricity, the park owner may consider only the​
actual amount billed by the public utility or electrical cooperative to the park owner for electricity​
furnished to residents. The park owner may not consider administrative, capital or other expenses.​
1R​
APPENDIX​
Repealed Minnesota Statutes: H0156-2​