Minnesota 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF167 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/06/2023

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; individual income tax; proposing a refundable tax credit for​
1.3 tax years 2021 and 2022.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. INCOME TAX REBATES.​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.The definitions in Minnesota Statutes, section 290.01, apply​
1.7to this section.​
1.8 Subd. 2.Tax rebate credit.For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020, and​
1.9before January 1, 2024, an individual income taxpayer is allowed a credit against the taxes​
1.10imposed in Minnesota Statutes, sections 290.03 and 290.091. The credit equals $1,000 each​
1.11taxable year for all filers.​
1.12 Subd. 3.Part-year residents.For an individual who was a resident of Minnesota for​
1.13less than the entire taxable year, the credit equals the amount determined under subdivision​
1.142 for the individual's filing status, multiplied by the percentage determined pursuant to​
1.15Minnesota Statutes, section 290.06, subdivision 2c, paragraph (e).​
1.16 Subd. 4.Credit refundable; appropriation.(a) If the amount of credit which a claimant​
1.17is eligible to receive under this section exceeds the claimant's liability for tax for taxes​
1.18imposed under Minnesota Statutes, sections 290.03 and 290.091, the commissioner shall​
1.19refund the excess to the claimant.​
1.20 (b) An amount sufficient to pay the refunds required by this section is appropriated to​
1.21the commissioner from the general fund.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR EAP/HL 23-00711​01/04/23 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  167​
NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
Authored by Quam and Davids​01/09/2023​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Taxes​ 2.1 Subd. 5.Distribution of credit payments; filing process for taxpayers without tax​
2.2liability.(a) To the extent feasible, the commissioner must automatically adjust the return​
2.3of any taxpayer who filed a return for a taxable year in which the credit under this section​
2.4applies. If a taxpayer is eligible for a refund as a result of the credit under this section, to​
2.5the extent feasible, the commissioner must distribute the refund via direct deposit to the​
2.6taxpayer's bank account, check, or any other mechanism the commissioner deems appropriate.​
2.7 (b) The commissioner must establish a simplified filing process through which a taxpayer​
2.8who did not file a return due to a lack of individual income tax liability may file a return​
2.9for the taxable years in which the credit is available. The filing process and forms may be​
2.10in the form or manner determined by the commissioner, but must be designed to reduce the​
2.11complexity of the filing process and the time needed to file for individuals without an income​
2.12tax liability for the taxable year.​
2.13 Subd. 6.Recapture of payments forbidden.The commissioner of revenue must not​
2.14apply, and must not certify to another agency to apply, a payment resulting from the credit​
2.15under this section to any unpaid tax or nontax debt owed by an individual.​
2.16 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for taxable years beginning​
2.17after December 31, 2020, and before January 1, 2023.​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR EAP/HL 23-00711​01/04/23 ​