Minnesota 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF293 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to health; requiring medical and dental practices to make available to the​
1.3 public their current standard charges; authorizing the commissioner of health to​
1.4 establish a price comparison tool for items and services offered by medical and​
1.5 dental practices; proposing coding for new law in Minnesota Statutes, chapter 62J.​
1.6BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.7 Section 1. [62J.826] MEDICAL AND DENTAL PRACTICES; CURRENT​
1.8STANDARD CHARGES; COMPARISON TOOL.​
1.9 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) The definitions in this subdivision apply to this section.​
1.10 (b) "CDT code" means a code value drawn from the Code on Dental Procedures and​
1.11Nomenclature published by the American Dental Association.​
1.12 (c) "Chargemaster" means the list of all individual items and services maintained by a​
1.13medical or dental practice for which the medical or dental practice has established a charge.​
1.14 (d) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of health.​
1.15 (e) "CPT code" means a code value drawn from the Current Procedural Terminology​
1.16published by the American Medical Association.​
1.17 (f) "Dental service" means a service charged using a CDT code.​
1.18 (g) "Diagnostic laboratory testing" means a service charged using a CPT code within​
1.19the CPT code range of 80047 to 89398.​
1.20 (h) "Diagnostic radiology service" means a service charged using a CPT code within​
1.21the CPT code range of 70010 to 79999 and includes the provision of x-rays, computed​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR	SGS H0293-1​HF293  FIRST ENGROSSMENT​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  293​
NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
Authored by Elkins, Bahner and Her​01/11/2023​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Health Finance and Policy​
Adoption of Report: Re-referred to the Committee on Commerce Finance and Policy​02/01/2023​
Adoption of Report: Amended and re-referred to the Committee on Health Finance and Policy​02/15/2023​ 2.1tomography scans, positron emission tomography scans, magnetic resonance imaging scans,​
2.2and mammographies.​
2.3 (i) "Hospital" means an acute care institution licensed under sections 144.50 to 144.58,​
2.4but does not include a health care institution conducted for those who rely primarily upon​
2.5treatment by prayer or spiritual means in accordance with the creed or tenets of any church​
2.6or denomination.​
2.7 (j) "Medical or dental practice" means a business that:​
2.8 (1) earns revenue by providing medical care or dental services to the public;​
2.9 (2) issues payment claims to health plan companies and other payers; and​
2.10 (3) may be identified by its federal tax identification number.​
2.11 (k) "Outpatient surgical center" means a health care facility other than a hospital offering​
2.12elective outpatient surgery under a license issued under sections 144.50 to 144.58.​
2.13 (l) "Standard charge" has the meaning given in Code of Federal Regulations, title 45,​
2.14section 180.20.​
2.15 Subd. 2.Requirement; current standard charges.The following medical or dental​
2.16practices must make available to the public a list of their current standard charges, as reflected​
2.17in the medical or dental practice's chargemaster, for all items and services provided by the​
2.18medical or dental practice:​
2.19 (1) hospitals;​
2.20 (2) outpatient surgical centers; and​
2.21 (3) any other medical or dental practice that has revenue of greater than $50,000,000​
2.22per year and that derives the majority of its revenue by providing one or more of the following​
2.23services:​
2.24 (i) diagnostic radiology services;​
2.25 (ii) diagnostic laboratory testing;​
2.26 (iii) orthopedic surgical procedures, including joint arthroplasty procedures within the​
2.27CPT code range of 26990 to 27899;​
2.28 (iv) ophthalmologic surgical procedures, including cataract surgery coded using CPT​
2.29code 66982 or 66984, or refractive correction surgery to improve visual acuity;​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR	SGS H0293-1​HF293 FIRST ENGROSSMENT​ 3.1 (v) anesthesia services commonly provided as an ancillary to services provided at a​
3.2hospital, outpatient surgical center, or medical practice that provides orthopedic surgical​
3.3procedures or ophthalmologic surgical procedures;​
3.4 (vi) oncology services, including radiation oncology treatments within the CPT code​
3.5range of 77261 to 77799 and drug infusions; or​
3.6 (vii) dental services.​
3.7 Subd. 3.Required file format and content.(a) A medical or dental practice that is​
3.8subject to this section must make available to the public, and must report to the commissioner,​
3.9current standard charges using the format and data elements specified in the currently​
3.10effective version of the Hospital Price Transparency Sample Format (Tall) (CSV) and related​
3.11data dictionary recommended for hospitals by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid​
3.12Services (CMS). If CMS modifies or replaces the specifications for this format, the form​
3.13of this file must be modified or replaced to conform with the new CMS specifications by​
3.14the date specified by CMS for compliance with its new specifications. All prices included​
3.15in the file must be expressed as dollar amounts. The data must be in the form of a comma​
3.16separated values file which can be directly imported, without further editing or remediation,​
3.17into a relational database table which has been designed to receive these files. The medical​
3.18or dental practice must make the file available to the public in a manner specified by the​
3.19commissioner and must report the file to the commissioner in a manner and frequency​
3.20specified by the commissioner.​
3.21 (b) A medical or dental practice must test its file for compliance with paragraph (a)​
3.22before making the file available to the public and reporting the file to the commissioner.​
3.23 (c) A hospital must comply with this section no later than January 1, 2024. A medical​
3.24or dental practice that meets the requirements in subdivision 2, clause (3), or an outpatient​
3.25surgical center must comply with this section no later than January 1, 2025.​
3.26 Subd. 4.Price comparison tool.The commissioner shall use the information reported​
3.27to the commissioner under subdivision 3 to develop and make available to the public a tool​
3.28for the public to use to compare charges for a specific item or service across medical and​
3.29dental practices that offer that item or service. The commissioner may contract with a third​
3.30party for the development and operation of this tool. The price comparison tool must be​
3.31made available to the public by July 1, 2024.​
3​Section 1.​
REVISOR	SGS H0293-1​HF293 FIRST ENGROSSMENT​