Minnesota 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF10 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/03/2023

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to labor and industry; providing for use of skilled and trained contractor​
1.3 workforces at petroleum refineries; amending Minnesota Statutes 2022, section​
1.4 177.27, subdivision 4; proposing coding for new law in Minnesota Statutes, chapter​
1.5 181.​
1.6BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.7 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 177.27, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
1.8 Subd. 4.Compliance orders.The commissioner may issue an order requiring an​
1.9employer to comply with sections 177.21 to 177.435, 181.02, 181.03, 181.031, 181.032,​
1.10181.101, 181.11, 181.13, 181.14, 181.145, 181.15, 181.172, paragraph (a) or (d), 181.275,​
1.11subdivision 2a, 181.722, 181.79, and 181.939 to 181.943, and 181.987, or with any rule​
1.12promulgated under section 177.28. The commissioner shall issue an order requiring an​
1.13employer to comply with sections 177.41 to 177.435 or 181.987 if the violation is repeated.​
1.14For purposes of this subdivision only, a violation is repeated if at any time during the two​
1.15years that preceded the date of violation, the commissioner issued an order to the employer​
1.16for violation of sections 177.41 to 177.435 or 181.987 and the order is final or the​
1.17commissioner and the employer have entered into a settlement agreement that required the​
1.18employer to pay back wages that were required by sections 177.41 to 177.435. The​
1.19department shall serve the order upon the employer or the employer's authorized​
1.20representative in person or by certified mail at the employer's place of business. An employer​
1.21who wishes to contest the order must file written notice of objection to the order with the​
1.22commissioner within 15 calendar days after being served with the order. A contested case​
1.23proceeding must then be held in accordance with sections 14.57 to 14.69. If, within 15​
1​Section 1.​
23-01381 as introduced​12/22/22 REVISOR SS/RC​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 10​NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: SEEBERGER and Dziedzic)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/04/2023​
Referred to Labor​ 2.1calendar days after being served with the order, the employer fails to file a written notice​
2.2of objection with the commissioner, the order becomes a final order of the commissioner.​
2.3 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective October 15, 2023.​
2.4 Sec. 2. [181.987] USE OF SKILLED AND TRAINED CONTRACTOR​
2.5WORKFORCES AT PETROLEUM REFINERIES.​
2.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
2.7the meanings given.​
2.8 (b) "Contractor" means a vendor that enters into or seeks to enter into a contract with​
2.9an owner or operator of a petroleum refinery to perform construction, alteration, demolition,​
2.10installation, repair, maintenance, or hazardous material handling work at the site of the​
2.11petroleum refinery. Contractor includes all contractors or subcontractors of any tier​
2.12performing work as described in this paragraph at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
2.13Contractor does not include employees of the owner or operator of a petroleum refinery.​
2.14 (c) "Registered apprenticeship program" means an apprenticeship program providing​
2.15to each trainee combined classroom and on-the-job training under the direct and close​
2.16supervision of a highly skilled worker in an occupation recognized as an apprenticeable​
2.17occupation registered with the Department of Labor and Industry under chapter 178 or with​
2.18the United States Department of Labor Office of Apprenticeship or a recognized state​
2.19apprenticeship agency under Code of Federal Regulations, title 29, parts 29 and 30.​
2.20 (d) "Skilled and trained workforce" means a workforce in which each employee of the​
2.21contractor or subcontractor of any tier working at the site of the petroleum refinery meets​
2.22one of the following criteria:​
2.23 (1) are currently registered as apprentices in a registered apprenticeship program in the​
2.24applicable trade;​
2.25 (2) have graduated from a registered apprenticeship program in the applicable trade; or​
2.26 (3) have completed all of the classroom training and work hour requirements needed to​
2.27graduate from the registered apprenticeship program their employer participates in.​
2.28 (e) "Petroleum refinery" means a facility engaged in producing and storing gasoline,​
2.29kerosene, distillate fuel oils, residual fuel oil, lubricants, or other products through distillation​
2.30of petroleum or through redistillation, cracking, or reforming of unfinished petroleum​
2.31derivatives. Petroleum refinery includes fluid catalytic cracking unit catalyst regenerators,​
2​Sec. 2.​
23-01381 as introduced​12/22/22 REVISOR SS/RC​ 3.1fluid catalytic cracking unit incinerator-waste heat boilers, fuel gas combustion devices,​
3.2and indirect heating equipment associated with the refinery.​
3.3 (f) "Apprenticeable occupation" means any trade, form of employment, or occupation​
3.4approved for apprenticeship by the commissioner of labor and industry or the United States​
3.5Secretary of Labor.​
3.6 (g) "OEM" means original equipment manufacturer and refers to organizations that​
3.7manufacture or fabricate equipment for sale directly to purchasers or other resellers.​
3.8 Subd. 2.Use of contractors by owner, operator; requirement.(a) An owner or operator​
3.9of a petroleum refinery shall, when contracting with contractors for the performance of​
3.10construction, alteration, demolition, installation, repair, maintenance, or hazardous material​
3.11handling work at the site of the petroleum refinery, require that the contractors performing​
3.12that work, and any subcontractors of any tier, use a skilled and trained workforce when​
3.13performing all work at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
3.14 (b) The requirement under this subdivision applies only when each contractor and​
3.15subcontractor of any tier is performing work at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
3.16 (c) The requirement under this subdivision does not apply to contractors or subcontractors​
3.17hired to perform OEM work to comply with equipment warranty requirements.​
3.18 (d) A contractor's workforce must meet the requirements of subdivision 1, paragraph​
3.19(d) according to the following schedule:​
3.20 (1) 65 percent by October 15, 2023;​
3.21 (2) 75 percent by October 15, 2024; and​
3.22 (3) 85 percent by October 15, 2025.​
3.23 (e) An owner or operator, or contractor or subcontractor of an owner or operator, is​
3.24exempt from this section if:​
3.25 (1) the owner or operator or contractor or subcontractor has entered into a project labor​
3.26agreement or collectively bargained maintenance agreement with a labor organization with​
3.27a registered apprenticeship program; and​
3.28 (2) all contracted work at the petroleum refinery that is subject to this section is also​
3.29subject to a project labor agreement or collectively bargained maintenance agreement.​
3.30 Subd. 3.Penalties.The Division of Labor Standards shall receive complaints of violations​
3.31of this section. The commissioner of labor and industry shall fine an owner, operator,​
3.32contractor, or subcontractor of any tier not less than $5,000 nor more than $10,000 for each​
3​Sec. 2.​
23-01381 as introduced​12/22/22 REVISOR SS/RC​ 4.1violation of the requirements in this section. Each shift on which a violation of this section​
4.2occurs shall be considered a separate violation. This penalty is in addition to any penalties​
4.3provided under section 177.27, subdivision 7. In determining the amount of a civil penalty​
4.4under this subdivision, the appropriateness of the penalty to the size of the violator's business​
4.5and the gravity of the violation shall be considered.​
4.6 Subd. 4.Civil actions.A person injured by a violation of this section may bring a civil​
4.7action for damages against an owner or operator of a petroleum refinery. The court may​
4.8award to a prevailing plaintiff under this subdivision damages, attorney fees, costs,​
4.9disbursements, and any other appropriate relief as otherwise provided by law.​
4.10 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective October 15, 2023.​
4​Sec. 2.​
23-01381 as introduced​12/22/22 REVISOR SS/RC​