Minnesota 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF1710 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2025

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to energy; appropriating money for an ammonia, hydrogen, and renewable​
1.3 energy certificate tracking system; requiring reports.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. APPROPRIATION; AMMONIA, HYDROGEN, AND RENEWABLE​
1.6ENERGY CERTIFICATE TRACKING SYSTEM.​
1.7 (a) $9,000,000 in fiscal year ..... is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner​
1.8of commerce for a grant to the Midwest Renewable Energy Tracking System for technology​
1.9that enables tradable ammonia, hydrogen, and renewable energy certificates.​
1.10 (b) Beginning January 1, 2026, and through January 1, 2030, an entity that receives a​
1.11grant under this section must submit a report to the Legislative Auditor that details how the​
1.12grant money received has been spent.​
1.13 (c) Beginning January 1, 2030, and through January 1, 2035, an entity that receives a​
1.14grant under this section must report to the commissioners of commerce and agriculture​
1.15regarding the number of green ammonia certificates issued in Minnesota as a result of the​
1.16grant money received.​
1​Section 1.​
25-00715 as introduced​01/15/25 REVISOR RSI/ES​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 1710​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: PUTNAM)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​02/20/2025​
Referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate​