Minnesota 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2831 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/19/2025

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to education; extending Minnesota State High School League tickets and​
1.3 admissions sales tax savings; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, sections 128C.24;​
1.4 297A.70, subdivision 11a; Laws 2017, First Special Session chapter 1, article 3,​
1.5 sections 4; 26.​
1.6BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.7 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 128C.24, is amended to read:​
1.8 128C.24 LEAGUE FUNDS TRANSFER.​
1.9 Beginning (a) Every July 1, 2007, the Minnesota State High School League shall annually​
1.10must determine the sales tax savings attributable to section 297A.70, subdivision 11a, and​
1.11annually transfer that amount to a nonprofit charitable foundation created for the purpose​
1.12of promoting high school extracurricular activities. The funds must be used by the foundation​
1.13to make grants to fund, assist, recognize, or promote high school students' participation in​
1.14extracurricular activities. The first priority for funding will be grants for scholarships to​
1.15individuals to offset athletic fees. The foundation must equitably award grants based on​
1.16considerations of gender balance, school size, and geographic location, to the extent feasible.​
1.17 (b) This section expires July 1, 2037.​
1.18 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
1.19 Sec. 2. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 297A.70, subdivision 11a, is amended to read:​
1.20 Subd. 11a.Minnesota State High School League tickets and admissions.(a) Tickets​
1.21and admissions to games, events, and activities sponsored by the Minnesota State High​
1.22School League under chapter 128C are exempt.​
1​Sec. 2.​
25-04072 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR CR/DG​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 2831​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: CWODZINSKI)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
Referred to Education Policy​ 2.1 (b) This section expires July 1, 2037.​
2.2 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2.3 Sec. 3. Laws 2017, First Special Session chapter 1, article 3, section 4, the effective date,​
2.4is amended to read:​
2.5 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective for sales and purchases made after June​
2.630, 2017, and before July 1, 2027.​
2.7 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2.8 Sec. 4. Laws 2017, First Special Session chapter 1, article 3, section 26, the effective date,​
2.9is amended to read:​
2.10 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective for sales and purchases made after June​
2.1130, 2017, and before July 1, 2027.​
2.12 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2​Sec. 4.​
25-04072 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR CR/DG​