Minnesota 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF3484 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/02/2025

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; expanding the definition of partnership policy for​
1.3 purposes of the Minnesota partnership for long-term care program; amending​
1.4 Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0571, subdivision 6.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0571, subdivision 6, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 6.Partnership policy."Partnership policy" means a long-term care insurance​
1.8policy that meets the criteria in sections 62S.23, subdivision 1, paragraph (b), and 62S.312​
1.9and was issued on or after July 1, 2006, or exchanged on or after July 1, 2006, under the​
1.10provisions of section 62S.24, subdivision 8. Partnership policy includes a long-term care​
1.11insurance policy sold prior to July 1, 2015, with inflation protection between one and three​
1.12percent.​
1.13 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective January 1, 2027, or upon federal approval,​
1.14whichever is later. The commissioner of human services shall notify the revisor of statutes​
1.15when federal approval is obtained.​
1​Section 1.​
25-05581 as introduced​04/30/25 REVISOR AGW/HL​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 3484​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: KUPEC)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​05/05/2025​
Referred to Human Services​