Minnesota 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF387 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/16/2025

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; local government aid; establishing public safety aid for local​
1.3 governments and Tribal governments; appropriating money.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. 2025 PUBLIC SAFETY AID.​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.For purposes of this section, the following terms have the​
1.7meanings given:​
1.8 (1) "commissioner" means the commissioner of revenue;​
1.9 (2) "local unit" means (i) a town with a population of at least 10,000, or (ii) a statutory​
1.10or home rule charter city;​
1.11 (3) "population" means population estimates made or conducted by the United States​
1.12Bureau of the Census; the Metropolitan Council pursuant to Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.13473.24; or by the state demographer pursuant to Minnesota Statutes, section 4A.02, paragraph​
1.14(d), whichever is the most recent estimate and available as of January 1, 2025;​
1.15 (4) "Tribal governments" has the meaning given to "Minnesota Tribal governments" in​
1.16Minnesota Statutes, section 10.65, subdivision 2, clause (4); and​
1.17 (5) "Tribal population" means population estimates made or conducted by the United​
1.18States Bureau of the Census of the federally recognized American Indian reservations and​
1.19off-reservation trust lands in Minnesota, whichever is the most recent estimate and available​
1.20as of January 1, 2025.​
1.21 Subd. 2.County aid.A county's public safety aid equals the sum of:​
1​Section 1.​
25-00853 as introduced​12/04/24 REVISOR MS/NS​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 387​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: GUSTAFSON, Housley and Johnson Stewart)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/21/2025​
Referred to Taxes​ 2.1 (1) the product of (i) the county's population, and (ii) the county basic allowance; plus​
2.2 (2) the product of (i) the county's population minus the total population of every local​
2.3unit located in that county, and (ii) the county additional allowance.​
2.4 Subd. 3.Tribal government aid.A Tribal government's public safety aid equals the​
2.5sum of:​
2.6 (1) the product of (i) the Tribe's population, and (ii) the county basic allowance; plus​
2.7 (2) the product of (i) the Tribe's population, and (ii) the county additional allowance.​
2.8 Subd. 4.Local unit aid.A local unit's public safety aid equals the product of (1) the​
2.9local unit's population, and (2) the local unit allowance.​
2.10 Subd. 5.Commissioner to calculate allowances.(a) The commissioner must calculate​
2.11the county basic allowance so that the total amount of aid distributed under subdivisions 2,​
2.12clause (1), and 3, clause (1), equals 70 percent of the amount appropriated for aid to counties​
2.13and Tribal governments.​
2.14 (b) The commissioner must calculate the county additional allowance so that the total​
2.15amount of aid distributed under subdivisions 2, clause (2), and 3, clause (2), equals 30​
2.16percent of the amount appropriated for aid to counties and Tribal governments.​
2.17 (c) The commissioner must calculate the local unit allowance so that the total amount​
2.18of aid distributed under subdivision 4 equals the amount appropriated for aid to local units.​
2.19 Subd. 6.Eligible uses.(a) A county, Tribal government, or local unit must use the aid​
2.20under this section to provide public safety, including community violence prevention and​
2.21intervention programs; community engagement; mental health crisis responses; victim​
2.22services; training programs; first responder wellness; equipment related to fire, rescue, and​
2.23emergency services; or to pay other personnel or equipment costs.​
2.24 (b) Notwithstanding paragraph (a), a county, Tribal government, or local unit may not​
2.25apply the aid under this section toward:​
2.26 (1) its employer contribution to the public employees police and fire fund if the county,​
2.27Tribal government, or local unit received police state aid under Minnesota Statutes, chapter​
2.28477C, in calendar year 2024;​
2.29 (2) any costs associated with alleged wrongdoing or misconduct;​
2.30 (3) the purchase of an armored or tactical vehicle or substantially similar vehicle;​
2.31 (4) the purchase of tear gas, chemical munitions, or substantially similar items; or​
2​Section 1.​
25-00853 as introduced​12/04/24 REVISOR MS/NS​ 3.1 (5) the costs of construction, reconstruction, remodeling, expansion, or improvement of​
3.2a police station, including related facilities. For purposes of this clause, "related facilities"​
3.3includes access roads, lighting, sidewalks, and utility components on or adjacent to the​
3.4property on which the police station is located that are necessary for safe access to and use​
3.5of the building.​
3.6 Subd. 7.Certification; payment date.The commissioner must certify the aid amount​
3.7to be paid in 2025 to each county, Tribal government, and local unit by September 1, 2025.​
3.8The commissioner must make the full 2025 payment to each county, Tribal government,​
3.9and local unit by December 26, 2025.​
3.10 Subd. 8.Appropriation.(a) $300,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the​
3.11general fund to the commissioner of revenue for public safety aid under this section.​
3.12 (b) Of the amount in paragraph (a), 30 percent is for aid to counties and Tribal​
3.13governments and 70 percent is for aid to local units.​
3.14 (c) This is a onetime appropriation.​
3.15 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective for aids payable in 2025.​
3​Section 1.​
25-00853 as introduced​12/04/24 REVISOR MS/NS​