Missouri 2023 2023 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB836 Introduced / Fiscal Note

                    COMMITTEE ON LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH
OVERSIGHT DIVISION
FISCAL NOTE
L.R. No.:1829H.01P Bill No.:Perfected HB 836  Subject:Veterans; Department of Public Safety; Military Affairs Type:Original  Date:April 18, 2023Bill Summary:This proposal establishes the Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation 
Freedom’s Sentinel and Operation Allies Refuge Program which authorizes 
the issuance of a medallion, medal, and certificate to certain veterans who 
served in specified conflicts.
FISCAL SUMMARY
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON GENERAL REVENUE FUNDFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net 
Effect on General 
Revenue $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON OTHER STATE FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Veterans Commission 
Capital Improvement 
Trust Fund (0304)
Less than 
($73,000)
Less than 
 ($73,000)
Less than 
 ($73,000)
Total Estimated Net 
Effect on Other State 
Funds
Less than 
 ($73,000)
Less than
  ($73,000)
Less than 
 ($73,000)
Numbers within parentheses: () indicate costs or losses. L.R. No. 1829H.01P 
Bill No. Perfected HB 836  
Page 2 of 
April 18, 2023
DD:LR:OD
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FEDERAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net 
Effect on All Federal 
Funds $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FULL TIME EQUIVALENT (FTE)FUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net 
Effect on FTE 000
☐ Estimated Net Effect (expenditures or reduced revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any  
     of the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
☐ Estimated Net Effect (savings or increased revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any of
     the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON LOCAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Local Government$0$0$0 L.R. No. 1829H.01P 
Bill No. Perfected HB 836  
Page 3 of 
April 18, 2023
DD:LR:OD
FISCAL ANALYSIS
ASSUMPTION
§43.212 – Medallion program
Officials from the Missouri National Guard (MNG) state with an estimated 73,000 active and 
registered veterans, HB 836 will have an approximate $1,000 - $1,095,000 fiscal impact to the 
Veterans Recognition program, which is funded by the Veterans Commission Capital 
Improvement Trust Fund, depending on the number of approved applicants. The estimated cost 
per medal and postage is $15.
Listed below are the number of medals awarded to the following programs:
2000 – WWII medals awarded 18,554 since inception
2003 – Korean War medals awarded 31,524 since inception
2006 – Vietnam War medals awarded 47,038 since inception
2019 – Operation Desert Storm/Desert Shield and Operation Iraqi Freedom/New Dawn 
medals awarded 931 since inception
Oversight contacted the MNG to inquire how many personnel deployed to Operation Enduring 
Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and Operation Allies Refuge Program. However, 
Oversight has not received that information yet. Therefore, using MNG’s estimate of 73,000 
current Missouri veterans, Oversight will assume approximately 40 percent of those served 
during this timeframe (10/7/2001 – 8/30/2021). Oversight also assumes approximately half or 
14,600 (73,000 * .40 *.50) service members and registered veterans will apply for the medal.  
14,600 x $15 = $219,000
Based on the implementation of other similar programs, Oversight will reflect this cost spread 
over the three years ($219,000 / 3 = $73,000) of the fiscal note to the Veterans Commission 
Capital Improvement Trust Fund.  Oversight notes the ending balance in the Veterans 
Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund (0304) as of March 31, 2023, is $31,649,894.
Officials from the Office of Administration assume the proposal will have no fiscal impact on 
their organization. Oversight does not have any information to the contrary. Therefore, 
Oversight will reflect a zero impact in the fiscal note.  
Officials from the Department of Public Safety – Missouri Veterans Commission defer to the 
Missouri National Guard for the potential fiscal impact of this proposal.  L.R. No. 1829H.01P 
Bill No. Perfected HB 836  
Page 4 of 
April 18, 2023
DD:LR:OD
FISCAL IMPACT – State GovernmentFY 2024
(10 Mo.)
FY 2025FY 2026VETERANS COMMISSION 
CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS 
TRUST FUND (0304)
Cost – MNG (§43.212) New medallion 
program
Less than  
($73,000)
Less than  
($73,000)
Less than  
($73,000)
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT TO 
THE VETERANS COMMISSION 
CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS 
TRUST FUND
Less than  
($73,000)
Less than  
($73,000)
Less than  
($73,000)
FISCAL IMPACT – Local GovernmentFY 2024
(10 Mo.)
FY 2025FY 2026$0$0$0
FISCAL IMPACT – Small Business
No direct fiscal impact to small businesses would be expected as a result of this proposal.
FISCAL DESCRIPTION
MILITARY MEDAL PROGRAMS (Section 43.212)
This bill establishes the "Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and 
Operation Allies Refuge Program". This Program would award medallions, medals, and 
certificates of appreciation to veterans who honorably served on active duty in the United States 
military service at any time between October 7, 2011, and August 30, 2021, and who were 
honorably separated and discharged from military service.
This legislation is not federally mandated, would not duplicate any other program and would not 
require additional capital improvements or rental space. L.R. No. 1829H.01P 
Bill No. Perfected HB 836  
Page 5 of 
April 18, 2023
DD:LR:OD
SOURCES OF INFORMATION
Department of Public Safety – 
Missouri Veterans Commission
Missouri National Guard
Office of Administration
Julie MorffRoss StropeDirectorAssistant DirectorApril 18, 2023April 18, 2023