Missouri 2024 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1496 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/25/2024

                    COMMITTEE ON LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH
OVERSIGHT DIVISION
FISCAL NOTE
L.R. No.:3568H.01I Bill No.:HB 1496  Subject:Department of Public Safety; Military Affairs; Veterans Type:Original  Date:January 25, 2024Bill Summary:This proposal establishes the operation enduring freedom, operation 
freedom's sentinel and operation allies refuge program which authorizes the 
issuance of a medallion, medal, and certificate to certain veterans who 
served in specified conflicts. 
FISCAL SUMMARY
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON GENERAL REVENUE FUNDFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on General 
Revenue $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON OTHER STATE FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Veterans Commission 
Capital Improvements 
Project
Less than ($73,000)Less than ($73,000)Less than ($73,000)
Total Estimated Net 
Effect on Other State 
FundsLess than ($73,000)Less than ($73,000)Less than ($73,000)
Numbers within parentheses: () indicate costs or losses. L.R. No. 3568H.01I 
Bill No. HB 1496  
Page 2 of 
January 25, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FEDERAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on All Federal 
Funds $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FULL TIME EQUIVALENT (FTE)FUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on FTE 000
☐ Estimated Net Effect (expenditures or reduced revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any  
     of the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
☐ Estimated Net Effect (savings or increased revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any of
     the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON LOCAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Local Government$0$0$0 L.R. No. 3568H.01I 
Bill No. HB 1496  
Page 3 of 
January 25, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
FISCAL ANALYSIS
ASSUMPTION
§42.312 – Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel and Operation Allies 
Refuge Program
Officials from the Missouri National Guard (MONG) estimates there are 73,000 veterans 
eligible to receive this award. HB 1496 will have an approximate $1,000 - $1,095,000 fiscal 
impact to the Veterans Recognition program, which is funded by the Veterans Commission 
Capital Improvement Trust Fund (0304). The wide range of estimated fiscal impact is due to the 
uncertainty of how many veterans will apply and be approved for the award. The estimated cost 
per award (medal, medallion, and certificate), including postage, is $15. The total estimated cost 
would be an accumulated cost, spanning future fiscal years over the life of the program.
There are several other programs currently in place to recognize veterans of previous conflicts. A 
summary of program activity is contained in the table below:
Oversight contacted the MNG to inquire how many personnel deployed to Operation Enduring 
Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and Operation Allies Refuge Program. However, 
Oversight did not received that information. Therefore, using MNG’s estimate of 73,000 current 
Missouri veterans, Oversight will assume approximately 40 percent of those served during this 
timeframe (10/7/2001 – 8/30/2021). Oversight also assumes approximately half or 14,600 
(73,000 * 0.40 * 50%) service members and registered veterans will apply for the medal.  14,600 
x $15 = $219,000
Based on the implementation of other similar programs, Oversight will reflect this cost spread 
over the three years ($219,000 / 3 = $73,000) of the fiscal note to the Veterans Commission 
Capital Improvement Trust Fund. Oversight notes the ending balance in the Veterans 
Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund (0304) as of December 31, 2023, is $28,640,873. L.R. No. 3568H.01I 
Bill No. HB 1496  
Page 4 of 
January 25, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
Officials from the Missouri Veterans Commission (MVC) defer to the MONG regarding the 
fiscal impact of the provisions of §42.312.
Officials from the Office of Administration assume the proposal will have no fiscal impact on 
their organization. Oversight does not have any information to the contrary. Therefore, 
Oversight will reflect a zero impact in the fiscal note.  
FISCAL IMPACT – State GovernmentFY 2025
(10 Mo.)
FY 2026FY 2027VETERANS COMMISSION 
CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS 
TRUST FUND (0304)
Cost – MONG - New medallion 
program (§43.212) p. 3
Less than 
($73,000)
Less than 
($73,000)
Less than 
($73,000)
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON 
THE VETERANS COMMISSION 
CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS 
TRUST FUND 
Less than 
($73,000)
Less than 
($73,000)
Less than 
($73,000)
FISCAL IMPACT – Local GovernmentFY 2025
(10 Mo.)
FY 2026FY 2027$0$0$0
FISCAL IMPACT – Small Business
No direct fiscal impact to small businesses would be expected as a result of this proposal. L.R. No. 3568H.01I 
Bill No. HB 1496  
Page 5 of 
January 25, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
FISCAL DESCRIPTION
This bill establishes the "Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and 
Operation Allies Refuge Program". This Program awards medallions, medals, and certificates of 
appreciation to a veteran that is a resident of this state, honorably served on active duty in the 
United States military service at any time between October 7, 2001, and August 30, 2021, and 
was honorably separated and discharged from military service.
This legislation is not federally mandated, would not duplicate any other program and would not 
require additional capital improvements or rental space.
SOURCES OF INFORMATION
Department of Public Safety – Missouri Veterans Commission
Missouri National Guard
Office of Administration
Julie MorffRoss StropeDirectorAssistant DirectorJanuary 25, 2024January 25, 2024