Missouri 2024 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2137 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/28/2024

                    COMMITTEE ON LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH
OVERSIGHT DIVISION
FISCAL NOTE
L.R. No.:4828H.01I Bill No.:HB 2137  Subject:Courts; Department of Public Safety; Attorneys; Law Enforcement Officers and 
Agencies; Evidence 
Type:Original  Date:February 28, 2024Bill Summary:Modifies provisions relating to the "pretrial witness protection services 
fund". 
FISCAL SUMMARY
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON GENERAL REVENUE FUNDFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on General 
Revenue $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON OTHER STATE FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Pretrial Witness 
Protection*(Unknown)(Unknown)(Unknown)
Total Estimated Net 
Effect on Other State 
Funds(Unknown)(Unknown)(Unknown)
*Reimbursements to law enforcement agencies and/or prosecuting or circuit attorney’s offices is 
assumed to be less than $250,000 annually based on past disbursements.
Numbers within parentheses: () indicate costs or losses. L.R. No. 4828H.01I 
Bill No. HB 2137  
Page 2 of 
February 28, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FEDERAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on All Federal 
Funds $0$0$0
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FULL TIME EQUIVALENT (FTE)FUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Total Estimated Net 
Effect on FTE 000
☐ Estimated Net Effect (expenditures or reduced revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any  
     of the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
☐ Estimated Net Effect (savings or increased revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any of
     the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act.
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON LOCAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2025FY 2026FY 2027Local GovernmentUnknownUnknownUnknown L.R. No. 4828H.01I 
Bill No. HB 2137  
Page 3 of 
February 28, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
FISCAL ANALYSIS
ASSUMPTION
§491.641 – Pretrial Witness Protection Services Fund
Officials from the Department of Public Safety (DPS) – Director’s Office state this legislation 
will make it easier for entities to spend funding from the Witness Protection Fund. This fund has 
been stagnate in spending since its creation. It is assumed that approximately $100,000 - 
$150,000 in reimbursements will be requested by law enforcement, county prosecutors and the 
circuit attorney for FY 2025; between $125,000 - $175,000 for FY 2026; and between $150,000 
- $200,000 for FY 2027.
Oversight notes the Pretrial Witness Protection Fund was enacted by HB 66 during the 2020 
Special session and became effective September 21, 2020. One million dollars was transferred 
into the fund and on June 30, 2021, the fund balance was $1,000,497. During FY 2022, another 
$1 million was transferred into the fund, as well as interest income, but only slightly over 
$14,400 was disbursed from the fund. The ending fund balance was just under $2 million. 
During FY 2023, distributions were approximately $39,300 and the year-end fund balance was 
$2,012,135. The fund balance as of January 31, 2024 was $2,029,154.
Oversight contacted DPS-DO officials to determine how DPS came up with the estimates 
provided above. Officials said this was a best guess as they have no way to calculate how much 
might be requested by law enforcement, county prosecutors and the circuit attorney in witness 
protection costs. Therefore, Oversight will assume an unknown impact to the Pretrial Witness 
Protection Fund (0868). Based on previous disbursements, Oversight assumes disbursements will 
be less than $250,000 annually.
Officials from the Office of Attorney General (AGO)
arising from this proposal can be absorbed with existing resources. However, the AGO may seek 
additional appropriations if the proposal results in a significant increase in litigation or 
investigation costs.
Oversight does not have any information to the contrary. Therefore, Oversight assumes the 
AGO will be able to perform any additional duties required by this proposal with current staff 
and resources and will reflect no fiscal impact to the AGO for fiscal note purposes.
Officials from the Department of Natural Resources, the DPS – Capital Police and Missouri 
Highway PatrolDepartment of Social Services, the Missouri Department of 
Conservation, the Office of the State Public Defender, the Office of the State Treasurer, the 
Phelps County Sheriff’s Department, Office of the State Courts Administrator and the 
Missouri Office of Prosecution Services each assume the proposal will have no fiscal impact 
on their respective organizations. Oversight does not have any information to the contrary. 
Therefore, Oversight will reflect a zero impact in the fiscal note for these agencies.   L.R. No. 4828H.01I 
Bill No. HB 2137  
Page 4 of 
February 28, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
Rule Promulgation
Officials from the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules assume this proposal is not 
anticipated to cause a fiscal impact beyond its current appropriation. 
Officials from the Office of the Secretary of State (SOS) note many bills considered by the 
General Assembly include provisions allowing or requiring agencies to submit rules and 
regulations to implement the act. The SOS is provided with core funding to handle a certain 
amount of normal activity resulting from each year's legislative session. The fiscal impact for 
this fiscal note to the SOS for Administrative Rules is less than $5,000. The SOS recognizes that 
this is a small amount and does not expect that additional funding would be required to meet 
these costs. However, the SOS also recognizes that many such bills may be passed by the 
General Assembly in a given year and that collectively the costs may be in excess of what the 
office can sustain with its core budget. Therefore, the SOS reserves the right to request funding 
for the cost of supporting administrative rules requirements should the need arise based on a 
review of the finally approved bills signed by the governor.
Oversight only reflects the responses received from state agencies and political subdivisions; 
however, other sheriffs’ departments and county prosecutors were requested to respond to this 
proposed legislation but did not. A listing of political subdivisions included in the Missouri 
Legislative Information System (MOLIS) database is available upon request.
FISCAL IMPACT – State GovernmentFY 2025
(10 Mo.)
FY 2026FY 2027PRETRIAL WITNESS 
PROTECTION FUND (0868)
Costs – DPS (§491.641) – 
reimbursement of pretrial witness 
protection costs p. 3(Unknown)(Unknown)(Unknown)
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON 
THE PRETRIAL WITNESS 
PROTECTION FUND(Unknown)(Unknown)(Unknown) L.R. No. 4828H.01I 
Bill No. HB 2137  
Page 5 of 
February 28, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
FISCAL IMPACT – Local GovernmentFY 2025
(10 Mo.)
FY 2026FY 2027LOCAL GOVERNMENTS – 
COUNTY PROSECUTORS AND 
LAW ENFORCEMENT
Income – County Prosecutors/Law 
Enforcement (§491.641) – 
reimbursement of pretrial witness 
protection costs p.3UnknownUnknownUnknown
ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON 
LOCAL GOVERNMENTSUnknownUnknownUnknown
FISCAL IMPACT – Small Business
No direct fiscal impact to small businesses would be expected as a result of this proposal.
FISCAL DESCRIPTION
Currently, any law enforcement agency may provide for the security of witnesses and others in 
criminal proceedings or investigations. This bill allows any prosecuting attorney's office to 
provide such security as well. The Department of Public Safety may authorize funds to be 
disbursed to prosecuting attorneys' offices for such offices to be able to provide security. 
(§491.641)
This legislation is not federally mandated, would not duplicate any other program and would not 
require additional capital improvements or rental space.
SOURCES OF INFORMATION
Attorney General’s Office
Department of Natural Resources
Department of Public Safety –
Capitol Police
Director’s Office
Missouri Highway Patrol
Department of Social Services
Missouri Department of Conservation
Office of the Secretary of State
Office of the State Public Defender L.R. No. 4828H.01I 
Bill No. HB 2137  
Page 6 of 
February 28, 2024
HWC:LR:OD
Office of the State Treasurer
Phelps County Sheriff’s Department
Joint Committee on Administrative Rules
Missouri Office of Prosecution Services
Office of the State Courts Administrator
Julie MorffRoss StropeDirectorAssistant DirectorFebruary 28, 2024February 28, 2024