MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Rules By: Representative Sanford House Concurrent Resolution 45 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION COMMENDING AND CONGRATULATING GRACELYNN PEARL BATTE FOR HER IMMENSE SUCCESS AT THE UNITED TAEKWONDO ALLIANCE COMPETITION IN BROMSGROVE, ENGLAND. WHEREAS, Gracelynn Pearl Batte, of Covington County, Mississippi, represented the United States as part of the United Taekwondo Alliance in a competition in Bromsgrove, England, in July 2024; and WHEREAS, the daughter of Thomas C. Batte and granddaughter of Audrey L. Batte, Gracelynn was born on September 25, 2007, and is currently a senior at Mt. Olive Attendance Center; and WHEREAS, Gracelynn obtained her 2nd degree blackbelt in Taekwondo on September 16, 2022, and she is a student teacher at Stance Martial Arts in Magee, Mississippi; and WHEREAS, on February 4, 2024, Gracelynn was chosen to represent Team USA Taekwondo for the United Taekwondo Alliance, and to prep for the competition in England, she trained for the following five months in Rockwall and Houston, Texas; and WHEREAS, on April 8, 2024, at the request of the Honorable Roger F. Wicker, United States Senator, a United States flag was flown over the United States Capitol for Gracelynn honoring her for Team USA Taekwondo representing the United States of America in England, and she was presented with a flag along with a letter from Senator Wicker and a certificate from Joseph R. DiPietro, PE, Acting Architect of the Capitol; and WHEREAS, after months of training and preparation, on July 14, 2024, Gracelynn competed in Bromsgrove, where she competed in both individual and team competitions, and she did amazing; and WHEREAS, overall, Gracelynn placed 1st in Individual Continuous Sparring, 1st in Team Patterns, 2nd in Individual Sparring, 2nd in Team Sparring and 4th in Individual Patterns; and WHEREAS, additionally, Gracelynn reigns as the United States champion in her United Taekwondo Alliance age bracket for points sparring; and WHEREAS, it is the policy of this Legislature to recognize and honor exceptional Mississippi student-athletes, especially those such as Gracelynn Pearl Batte, who has brought honor to her school, her community and the State of Mississippi: NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, THE SENATE CONCURRING THEREIN, That we do hereby commend and congratulate Gracelynn Pearl Batte for her immense success at the United Taekwondo Alliance competition in Bromsgrove, England, and extend most sincere wishes for continued success in all her future endeavors. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That copies of this resolution be furnished to Gracelynn Pearl Batte and to the members of the Capitol Press Corps. MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Rules By: Representative Sanford # House Concurrent Resolution 45 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION COMMENDING AND CONGRATULATING GRACELYNN PEARL BATTE FOR HER IMMENSE SUCCESS AT THE UNITED TAEKWONDO ALLIANCE COMPETITION IN BROMSGROVE, ENGLAND. WHEREAS, Gracelynn Pearl Batte, of Covington County, Mississippi, represented the United States as part of the United Taekwondo Alliance in a competition in Bromsgrove, England, in July 2024; and WHEREAS, the daughter of Thomas C. Batte and granddaughter of Audrey L. Batte, Gracelynn was born on September 25, 2007, and is currently a senior at Mt. Olive Attendance Center; and WHEREAS, Gracelynn obtained her 2nd degree blackbelt in Taekwondo on September 16, 2022, and she is a student teacher at Stance Martial Arts in Magee, Mississippi; and WHEREAS, on February 4, 2024, Gracelynn was chosen to represent Team USA Taekwondo for the United Taekwondo Alliance, and to prep for the competition in England, she trained for the following five months in Rockwall and Houston, Texas; and WHEREAS, on April 8, 2024, at the request of the Honorable Roger F. Wicker, United States Senator, a United States flag was flown over the United States Capitol for Gracelynn honoring her for Team USA Taekwondo representing the United States of America in England, and she was presented with a flag along with a letter from Senator Wicker and a certificate from Joseph R. DiPietro, PE, Acting Architect of the Capitol; and WHEREAS, after months of training and preparation, on July 14, 2024, Gracelynn competed in Bromsgrove, where she competed in both individual and team competitions, and she did amazing; and WHEREAS, overall, Gracelynn placed 1st in Individual Continuous Sparring, 1st in Team Patterns, 2nd in Individual Sparring, 2nd in Team Sparring and 4th in Individual Patterns; and WHEREAS, additionally, Gracelynn reigns as the United States champion in her United Taekwondo Alliance age bracket for points sparring; and WHEREAS, it is the policy of this Legislature to recognize and honor exceptional Mississippi student-athletes, especially those such as Gracelynn Pearl Batte, who has brought honor to her school, her community and the State of Mississippi: NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, THE SENATE CONCURRING THEREIN, That we do hereby commend and congratulate Gracelynn Pearl Batte for her immense success at the United Taekwondo Alliance competition in Bromsgrove, England, and extend most sincere wishes for continued success in all her future endeavors. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That copies of this resolution be furnished to Gracelynn Pearl Batte and to the members of the Capitol Press Corps.