MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Rules By: Representative White House Concurrent Resolution 70 (As Adopted by House) A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO EXTEND THE 2025 REGULAR SESSION OF THE LEGISLATURE; TO SUSPEND THE DEADLINES FOR THE PURPOSE OF PERMITTING THE FURTHER CONSIDERATION, FILING AND ADOPTION OF CONFERENCE REPORTS ON ANY APPROPRIATION BILLS THAT WERE IN CONFERENCE ON MARCH 28, 2025, ON HOUSE BILL NOS. 1126 and 1127, 2025 REGULAR SESSION, AND ON SENATE BILL NOS. 2146, 2840 and 3095, 2025 REGULAR SESSION; TO SET THE DATE OF SINE DIE ADJOURNMENT OF THE 2025 REGULAR SESSION OF THE LEGISLATURE ON FRIDAY, APRIL 11, 2025; AND TO PROVIDE THAT THIS RESOLUTION SHALL BE REPEALED AND OF NO FORCE OR EFFECT IF THE RESOLUTION IS NOT FINALLY ADOPTED IN THE SENATE BY 5:00 P.M. ON WEDNESDAY APRIL 2, 2025. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, THE SENATE CONCURRING THEREIN, That the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature is extended for a period of thirty (30) days from the final day of the ninety (90) calendar days of the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature, under the provisions of Section 36, Mississippi Constitution of 1890. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That all of the deadlines and other provisions imposed by Joint Rule No. 40, are suspended for the purpose of permitting the further consideration, filing and adoption of conference reports, after the deadlines for those actions in Joint Rule No. 40, on all of the following bills: (a) Any appropriation bills that were in conference on March 28, 2025, for the purpose of enacting a budget for the State of Mississippi for fiscal year 2026; (b) House Bill Nos. 1126 and 1127, 2025 Regular Session, and Senate Bill Nos. 2146 and 2840, 2025 Regular Session; and (c) Senate Bill No. 3095, 2025 Regular Session, for the purposes outlined in the bill and in the House amendment to the bill, including, but not limited to, providing for the long-term sustainability and viability of the Public Employees' Retirement System and establishing a continuous, dedicated stream of revenue for the Public Employees' Retirement System to help reduce the current unfunded liability of the retirement system. Appropriation bills are those bills that are designated as appropriation bills for the purpose of the deadlines imposed by Joint Rule No. 40. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature will stand adjourned Sine Die at 11:59 p.m. CDT on Friday, April 11, 2025. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That this resolution shall be repealed and of no force or effect if the resolution is not finally adopted in the Senate by 5:00 p.m. CDT on Wednesday, April 2, 2025. MISSISSIPPI LEGISLATURE 2025 Regular Session To: Rules By: Representative White # House Concurrent Resolution 70 ## (As Adopted by House) A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO EXTEND THE 2025 REGULAR SESSION OF THE LEGISLATURE; TO SUSPEND THE DEADLINES FOR THE PURPOSE OF PERMITTING THE FURTHER CONSIDERATION, FILING AND ADOPTION OF CONFERENCE REPORTS ON ANY APPROPRIATION BILLS THAT WERE IN CONFERENCE ON MARCH 28, 2025, ON HOUSE BILL NOS. 1126 and 1127, 2025 REGULAR SESSION, AND ON SENATE BILL NOS. 2146, 2840 and 3095, 2025 REGULAR SESSION; TO SET THE DATE OF SINE DIE ADJOURNMENT OF THE 2025 REGULAR SESSION OF THE LEGISLATURE ON FRIDAY, APRIL 11, 2025; AND TO PROVIDE THAT THIS RESOLUTION SHALL BE REPEALED AND OF NO FORCE OR EFFECT IF THE RESOLUTION IS NOT FINALLY ADOPTED IN THE SENATE BY 5:00 P.M. ON WEDNESDAY APRIL 2, 2025. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, THE SENATE CONCURRING THEREIN, That the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature is extended for a period of thirty (30) days from the final day of the ninety (90) calendar days of the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature, under the provisions of Section 36, Mississippi Constitution of 1890. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That all of the deadlines and other provisions imposed by Joint Rule No. 40, are suspended for the purpose of permitting the further consideration, filing and adoption of conference reports, after the deadlines for those actions in Joint Rule No. 40, on all of the following bills: (a) Any appropriation bills that were in conference on March 28, 2025, for the purpose of enacting a budget for the State of Mississippi for fiscal year 2026; (b) House Bill Nos. 1126 and 1127, 2025 Regular Session, and Senate Bill Nos. 2146 and 2840, 2025 Regular Session; and (c) Senate Bill No. 3095, 2025 Regular Session, for the purposes outlined in the bill and in the House amendment to the bill, including, but not limited to, providing for the long-term sustainability and viability of the Public Employees' Retirement System and establishing a continuous, dedicated stream of revenue for the Public Employees' Retirement System to help reduce the current unfunded liability of the retirement system. Appropriation bills are those bills that are designated as appropriation bills for the purpose of the deadlines imposed by Joint Rule No. 40. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That the 2025 Regular Session of the Legislature will stand adjourned Sine Die at 11:59 p.m. CDT on Friday, April 11, 2025. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That this resolution shall be repealed and of no force or effect if the resolution is not finally adopted in the Senate by 5:00 p.m. CDT on Wednesday, April 2, 2025.