Montana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Montana House Bill HB641 Introduced / Bill

                    **** 
69th Legislature 2025 	HB 641.1
- 1 - Authorized Print Version – HB 641 
1 HOUSE BILL NO. 641
2 INTRODUCED BY C. SPRUNGER
3
4 A BILL FOR AN ACT ENTITLED: “AN ACT REPEALING THE LEWIS AND CLARK BICENTENNIAL LICENSE 
5 PLATE PROGRAM; REMOVING THE DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE LEWIS AND CLARK BICENTENNIAL 
6 ACCOUNT; AMENDING SECTION 17-7-502, MCA; REPEALING SECTIONS 2-15-151 AND 90-1-115, MCA; 
7 AND PROVIDING AN EFFECTIVE DATE.”
8
9 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MONTANA:
10
11 Section 17-7-502, MCA, is amended to read:
12 "17-7-502.  (1) A statutory 
13 appropriation is an appropriation made by permanent law that authorizes spending by a state agency without 
14 the need for a biennial legislative appropriation or budget amendment.
15 (2) Except as provided in subsection (4), to be effective, a statutory appropriation must comply with 
16 both of the following provisions:
17 (a) The law containing the statutory authority must be listed in subsection (3).
18 (b) The law or portion of the law making a statutory appropriation must specifically state that a 
19 statutory appropriation is made as provided in this section.
20 (3) The following laws are the only laws containing statutory appropriations: 2-17-105; 5-11-120; 5-
21 11-407; 5-13-403; 5-13-404; 7-4-2502; 7-4-2924; 7-32-236; 10-1-108; 10-1-1202; 10-1-1303; 10-2-603; 10-2-
22 807; 10-3-203; 10-3-310; 10-3-312; 10-3-314; 10-3-316; 10-3-802; 10-3-1304; 10-4-304; 10-4-310; 15-1-121; 
23 15-1-142; 15-1-143; 15-1-218; 15-1-2302; 15-31-165; 15-31-1004; 15-31-1005; 15-35-108; 15-36-332; 15-37-
24 117; 15-39-110; 15-65-121; 15-70-128; 15-70-131; 15-70-132; 15-70-433; 16-11-119; 16-11-509; 17-3-106; 17-
25 3-212; 17-3-222; 17-3-241; 17-6-101; 17-6-214; 17-7-133; 17-7-215; 18-11-112; 19-3-319; 19-3-320; 19-6-410; 
26 19-9-702; 19-13-604; 19-17-301; 19-18-512; 19-19-305; 19-19-506; 19-20-604; 19-20-607; 19-21-203; 20-3-
27 369; 20-7-1709; 20-8-107; 20-9-250; 20-9-534; 20-9-622; [20-15-328]; 20-26-617; 20-26-1503; 22-1-327; 22-3-
28 116; 22-3-117; [22-3-1004]; 23-4-105; 23-5-306; 23-5-409; 23-5-612; 23-7-301; 23-7-402; 30-10-1004; 37-43- **** 
69th Legislature 2025 	HB 641.1
- 2 - Authorized Print Version – HB 641 
1 204; 37-50-209; 37-54-113; 39-71-503; 41-5-2011; 42-2-105; 44-4-1101; 44-4-1506; 44-12-213; 44-13-102; 50-
2 1-115; 53-1-109; 53-6-148; 53-9-113; 53-24-108; 53-24-206; 60-5-530; 60-11-115; 61-3-321; 61-3-415; 67-1-
3 309; 69-3-870; 69-4-527; 75-1-1101; 75-5-1108; 75-6-214; 75-11-313; 75-26-308; 76-13-150; 76-13-151; 76-
4 13-417; 76-17-103; 77-1-108; 77-2-362; 80-2-222; 80-4-416; 80-11-518; 80-11-1006; 81-1-112; 81-1-113; 81-2-
5 203; 81-7-106; 81-7-123; 81-10-103; 82-11-161; 85-20-1504; 85-20-1505; [85-25-102]; 87-1-603; 87-5-909; 90-
6 1-115; 90-1-205; 90-1-504; 90-6-331; and 90-9-306.
7 (4) There is a statutory appropriation to pay the principal, interest, premiums, and any costs or fees 
8 associated with issuing, paying, securing, redeeming, or defeasing all bonds, notes, or other obligations, as due 
9 in the ordinary course or when earlier called for redemption or defeased, that have been authorized and issued 
10 pursuant to the laws of Montana. Agencies that have entered into agreements authorized by the laws of 
11 Montana to pay the state treasurer, for deposit in accordance with 17-2-101 through 17-2-107, as determined 
12 by the state treasurer, an amount sufficient to pay the principal and interest as due on the bonds or notes have 
13 statutory appropriation authority for the payments. (In subsection (3): pursuant to sec. 10, Ch. 360, L. 1999, the 
14 inclusion of 19-20-604 terminates contingently when the amortization period for the teachers' retirement 
15 system's unfunded liability is 10 years or less; pursuant to sec. 73, Ch. 44, L. 2007, the inclusion of 19-6-410 
16 terminates contingently upon the death of the last recipient eligible under 19-6-709(2) for the supplemental 
17 benefit provided by 19-6-709; pursuant to sec. 5, Ch. 383, L. 2015, the inclusion of 85-25-102 is effective on 
18 occurrence of contingency; pursuant to sec. 6, Ch. 423, L. 2015, the inclusion of 22-3-116 and 22-3-117 
19 terminates June 30, 2025; pursuant to sec. 4, Ch. 122, L. 2017, the inclusion of 10-3-1304 terminates 
20 September 30, 2025; pursuant to sec. 1, Ch. 213, L. 2017, the inclusion of 90-6-331 terminates June 30, 2027; 
21 pursuant to sec. 10, Ch. 374, L. 2017, the inclusion of 76-17-103 terminates June 30, 2027; pursuant to secs. 
22 11, 12, and 14, Ch. 343, L. 2019, the inclusion of 15-35-108 terminates June 30, 2027; pursuant to sec. 1, Ch. 
23 408, L. 2019, the inclusion of 17-7-215 terminates June 30, 2029; pursuant to secs. 1, 2, 3, Ch. 139, L. 2021, 
24 the inclusion of 53-9-113 terminates June 30, 2027; pursuant to sec. 8, Ch. 200, L. 2021, the inclusion of 10-4-
25 310 terminates July 1, 2031; pursuant to secs. 3, 4, Ch. 404, L. 2021, the inclusion of 30-10-1004 terminates 
26 June 30, 2027; pursuant to sec. 5, Ch. 548, L. 2021, the inclusion of 50-1-115 terminates June 30, 2025; 
27 pursuant to secs. 5 and 12, Ch. 563, L. 2021, the inclusion of 22-3-1004 is effective July 1, 2027; pursuant to 
28 sec. 1, Ch. 20, L. 2023, sec. 2, Ch. 20, L. 2023, and sec. 3, Ch. 20, L. 2023, the inclusion of 81-1-112, 81-1- **** 
69th Legislature 2025 	HB 641.1
- 3 - Authorized Print Version – HB 641 
1 113, and 81-7-106 terminates June 30, 2029; pursuant to sec. 9, Ch. 44, L. 2023, the inclusion of 15-1-142 
2 terminates December 31, 2025; pursuant to sec. 10, Ch. 47, L. 2023, the inclusion of 15-1-2302 terminates 
3 June 30, 2025; pursuant to sec. 2, Ch. 374, L. 2023, the inclusion of 10-3-802 terminates June 30, 2031; 
4 pursuant to sec. 12, Ch. 558, L. 2023, the inclusion of 20-9-250 terminates December 31, 2029; pursuant to 
5 sec. 4, Ch. 621, L. 2023, the inclusion of 22-1-327 terminates July 1, 2029; pursuant to sec. 24, Ch. 722, L. 
6 2023, the inclusion of 17-7-133 terminates June 30, 2027; pursuant to sec. 10, Ch. 758, L. 2023, the inclusion 
7 of 44-4-1506 terminates June 30, 2027; and pursuant to sec. 10, Ch. 764, L. 2023, the inclusion of 15-1-143 
8 terminates December 31, 2025.)"
9
10 NEW SECTION. Section 2. 	Repealer.
11 repealed:
12 2-15-151. Lewis and Clark bicentennial license plates -- authorization to apply as sponsor -- use of 
13 proceeds.
14 90-1-115. Department of commerce Lewis and Clark bicentennial account -- Montana historical society 
15 Lewis and Clark bicentennial account.
16
17 NEW SECTION. Section 3. 	Effective date.
18 - END -