North Carolina 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina Senate Bill S550 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/25/2025

                    GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA 
SESSION 2025 
S 	D 
SENATE BILL DRS15254-TC-4  
 
 
 
Short Title: Coaches Care Act. 	(Public) 
Sponsors: Senators Theodros and Mohammed (Primary Sponsors). 
Referred to:  
 
*DRS15254 -TC-4* 
A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1 
AN ACT TO REQUIRE YOUTH ATHLETICS COACHES TO RECEIVE TRAINING IN 2 
YOUTH MENTAL HEALTH FIRST AID . 3 
The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 4 
SECTION 1. G.S. 115C-407.55(2) reads as rewritten:  5 
"(2) Student health and safety rules. – These rules shall govern requirements to 6 
ensure student health and safety during participation in interscholastic athletic 7 
activities, including rules related to concussionsconcussions, youth mental 8 
health first aid, and emergency action plans as required by 9 
G.S. 115C-407.57G.S. 115C-407.57, G.S. 115C-407.57A, and 10 
G.S. 115C-407.58. The adoption of these rules shall not be delegated to an 11 
administering organization and student health and safety rules shall not be 12 
altered or expanded by an administering organization." 13 
SECTION 2. Article 29E of Chapter 115C is amended by adding a new section to 14 
read:  15 
"§ 115C-407.57A. Rules on mental health first aid training for coaches. 16 
(a) For the purposes of this section, a "training program" is a youth mental health first 17 
aid program that offers training and certification in the following:  18 
(1) Recognizing the signs and symptoms of mental health challenges and 19 
substance abuse.  20 
(2) Assisting youth that are experiencing mental health challenges.  21 
(3) Connecting youth with professional resources that can provide additional care.  22 
(b) The State Board of Education shall consult with the Center for Safer Schools, the 23 
Department of Health and Human Services, and the University of North Carolina School of 24 
Social Work on the selection of approved training programs. The State Board of Education shall 25 
annually publish on the State Board of Education's website a list of approved training programs 26 
no later than March 1.  27 
(c) With regard to middle schools and high schools, the State Board of Education shall 28 
adopt rules that require all coaches and athletic directors to possess an unexpired certification 29 
from a training program approved by the State Board of Education.  30 
(d) Each middle and high school shall maintain complete and accurate records of its 31 
compliance with the requirements of this section." 32 
SECTION 3. Article 18 of Chapter 160A is amended by adding a new section to 33 
read:  34 
"§ 160A-358. Youth athletics.  35 
(a) For the purposes of this section, the following definitions apply:  36 
FILED SENATE
Mar 25, 2025
S.B. 550
PRINCIPAL CLERK General Assembly Of North Carolina 	Session 2025 
Page 2  	DRS15254-TC-4 
(1) A youth athletics organization is any local government entity, nonprofit 1 
organization, or other entity that organizes and conducts athletic competitions 2 
for participation by persons under the age of 18.  3 
(2) A coach is any person over the age of 18 that provides instruction in athletics 4 
to persons under the age of 18.  5 
(b) No county or city shall allow a youth athletics organization to access county or city 6 
owned parks, recreational centers, or recreational facilities unless the youth athletics organization 7 
can demonstrate that all coaches possess an unexpired certification from a youth mental health 8 
first aid training program approved by the State Board of Education pursuant to 9 
G.S. 115C-407.57A. 10 
(c) Each county and city shall maintain complete and accurate records of its compliance 11 
with the requirements of this section." 12 
SECTION 4. The State Board of Education shall select The National Council for 13 
Mental Wellbeing's Youth Mental Health First Aid course and Teen Mental Health First Aid 14 
course as the approved training programs and publish that selection no later than March 1, 2026 15 
and annually thereafter until March 1, 2030, if the National Council for Mental Wellbeing 16 
continues to offer those courses. The State Board of Education may review those courses and 17 
select other courses as provided in G.S. 115C-407.57A for publication beginning March 1, 2031, 18 
or if there is evidence of substantial changes to the curriculum of those courses before March 1, 19 
2031.  20 
SECTION 5. The act is effective when it becomes law and applies beginning on July 21 
1, 2026.   22