North Dakota 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Dakota Senate Bill SB2006 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    25.0173.03000
Sixty-ninth
Legislative Assembly
of North Dakota
Introduced by
Appropriations Committee
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota 
aeronautics commission; and to provide an exemption.
BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY OF NORTH DAKOTA:
SECTION 1. APPROPRIATION. The funds provided in this section, or so much of the funds 
as may be necessary, are appropriated out of any moneys in the general fund in the state 
treasury, not otherwise appropriated, and from other funds derived from special funds and 
federal funds, to the North Dakota aeronautics commission for the purpose of defraying the 
expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission, for the biennium beginning July 1, 
2025, and ending June 30, 2027, as follows:
Adjustments or
Base Level Enhancements Appropriation
Salaries and wages	$1,789,878 $132,794 $1,922,672
New and vacant FTE pool	0 20,495 20,495
Operating expenses	3,285,000	(119) 3,284,881
Grants	27,100,000 3,775,000 30,875,000
Total all funds	$32,174,878 $3,928,170 $36,103,048
Less other funds	31,699,878 3,928,170 35,628,048
Total general fund	$475,000	$0 $475,000
Full-time equivalent positions	7.00	0.00 7.00
SECTION 2. NEW AND VACANT FTE POOL - LIMITATION - TRANSFER REQUEST. The 
North Dakota aeronautics commission may not spend funds appropriated in the new and vacant 
FTE pool line item in section 1 of this Act, but may request the office of management and 
Page No. 1	25.0173.03000
ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 2006
FIRST ENGROSSMENT
with House Amendments
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22 Sixty-ninth
Legislative Assembly
budget to transfer funds from the new and vacant FTE pool line item to the salaries and wages 
line item in accordance with the guidelines and reporting provisions included in House Bill 
No. 1015, as approved by the sixty-ninth legislative assembly.
SECTION 3. OTHER FUNDS - AIRPORT INFRASTRUCTURE FUND - AIRPORT 
GRANTS - EXEMPTION. The other funds appropriation in section 1 of this Act includes 
$20,000,000 from the airport infrastructure fund for the aeronautics commission to provide 
grants to airports during the biennium beginning July 1, 2025, and ending June 30, 2027. 
Section 54-44.1-11 does not apply to this funding, and any funds not spent by June 30, 2027, 
must be continued into the biennium beginning July 1, 2027, and ending June 30, 2029, and 
may be expended only for providing grants to airports.
SECTION 4. EXEMPTION - INTERNATIONAL PEACE GARDEN AIRPORT 
REHABILITATION PROJECT. The sum of $3,750,000 appropriated from federal funds and 
special funds for the International Peace Garden airport pavement rehabilitation project in 
section 1 of chapter 6 of the 2023 Session Laws is not subject to the provisions of section 
54-44.1-11 and any unexpended funds from these appropriations are available and may be 
expended during the biennium beginning July 1, 2025, and ending June 30, 2027.
Page No. 2	25.0173.03000
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16