Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB113 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/31/2025

                    PREPARED BY: John Wiemer 
LB 113 DATE PREPARED: January 31, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0051 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 113 amends the Nebraska Liquor Control Act. 
 
Under the bill, the holder of a manufacturer’s license may continue to operate up to ten, a change from five, retail locations which are in 
operation at the time such manufacturer’s license is issued and shall divest itself from retail locations in excess of ten, a change from 
five, locations. 
 
The bill changes the number of licensed premises for craft brewery and microdistillery licensees from five to ten separate 	physical 
locations. 
 
The bill amends requirements for holders of microdistillery licenses so that they may directly sell for resale up to $5,000 gallons per 
calendar year of microdistilled products produced at their licensed premises directly to retail licensees located in the State of Nebraska 
which hold the appropriate retail license, under specified conditions. This is a change from 500 gallons per calendar year. 
 
The Nebraska Liquor Control Commission estimates no fiscal impact. There is no basis to disagree with this estimate. 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:    113                AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Liquor Control Commission 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE: 1/15/2025                                  PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Liquor Control Commission’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 113.   
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:    113               AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Association of County Officials 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                          DATE: 1/15/2025                                  PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with NACO’s estimated minimal savings as a result of LB 113.    
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:   113                AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Lancaster County Clerk 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   1/21/2025                                	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Lancaster County Clerk’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 113.   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 113 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Lancaster County Clerk 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Matt Hansen 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/17/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 (402) 441-7481 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 113 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Liquor Control Commission 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) LeAnna Prange Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/14/25 Phone: 
(5)
 471-4892 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact expected.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 113 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Association of County Officials 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Elaine Menzel Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/15/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402.434.5660 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
LB 113 would allow a holder of manu	facturer of alcohol license to operate up to ten retail locations increased 
from five retail locations and craft brewers and microdistilleries to operate up to ten increased from five 
physical locations. These increases would 	lessen the administerial processing required by the county and 
result in minimal savings to them.  
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements………………… …...    
      TOTAL…………………………… ….....