Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB114 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/09/2025

                    ONE HUNDRED NINTH LEGISLATURE - FIRST SESSION - 2025
COMMITTEE STATEMENT
LB114
 
 
Hearing Date: Monday February 03, 2025
Committee On: Transportation and Telecommunications
Introducer: Moser
One Liner: Change provisions relating to Department of Motor Vehicles fees
 
 
Roll Call Vote - Final Committee Action:
          Advanced to General File with amendment(s)
 
 
Vote Results:
          Aye:	7 Senators Moser, Bosn, Brandt, DeBoer, Fredrickson, Guereca, Storer
          Nay: 
          Absent: 
          Present Not Voting:1 Senator Ballard
 
 
Testimony:
Proponents: 	Representing: 
Senator Mike Moser 	Opening Presenter
Rhonda Lahm	Nebraska Department of Motor Vehicles
 
Opponents: 	Representing: 
Robert M. Bell	Nebraska Insurance Federation
Ann Parr	Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Mary Vaggalis	Consumer Data Industry Association, Independent
Insurance Agents of Nebraska, Nebraska Retail
Federation
 
Neutral: 	Representing: 
 
* ADA Accommodation Written Testimony
 
 
Summary of purpose and/or changes:
LB 114 addresses Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) fee increases for both operator license searches and
registration and titling searches, differentiating between individual record searches and bulk searches. It also clarifies
to which funds the proceeds of such fees should be directed. Finally, it modifies the definition of vehicle,
distinguishing it from motor vehicle.  Total driver fees would be twenty-four dollars per record, up from seven dollars
and fifty cents.  The majority of the fee increase would be credited to the General Fund.  Fees for bulk searches are
also increased, with different fees for searches under two thousand records and searches over two thousand records.
 
 
Explanation of amendments:
The Committee considered and adopted an amendment which accomplishes the following:
Committee Statement: LB114
Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Page 1 111e7fb7e73c956dfb72780a82632219 Reduces the proposed fee increases by around half.  The new total driver fees total fifteen dollars, up from seven
dollars and fifty cents.  Bulk search fees were also lowered, with searches over two thousand records costing
twenty-five dollars before July 1, 20226 and thirty-five dollars after July 1, 2026.   
------------------------------------------ 
Section 1 - Amends section 60-483 – Operator’s license searches, fees 
Raises the fee from six cents to fifteen cents for a single operator license search of the DMV database. Nine of the
fifteen cents will be remitted directly to the DMV Cash Fund. The remaining six will be apportioned between the DMV
Cash Fund, the General Fund, and the Records Management Fund. 
Larger searches of header information, including name, license numbers, date of birth, address, and physical
description will be charged a fee of thirty dollars per thousand records, up from eighteen dollars. 
Searches will also be accompanied by a fee of twenty-one dollars, five dollars and fifty cents of which will be directed
to the DMV Cash Fund, eleven dollars and fifty cents to the General Fund, and four dollars to the Operator’s License
Services System Replacement and Maintenance Fund. 
Section 2 – Amends section 60-1506 – Registration and titling records 
Defines vehicle as any motor vehicle, trailer, motorboat, all-terrain vehicle, utility-type vehicle, snowmobile, or
minibike. 
     It mandates that the DMV keep a record of each vehicle and to issue a copy of which to any person who has
provided the name on the registration or certificate of title, the license plate number, the vehicle identification or other
type of identification number, or the title number of the vehicle. A fee of three dollars will be charged for the coffee,
which will be directed to the License Plate Cash Fund. 
     An extract of the entire file of vehicles registered or titled in the state can be requested. Before July 1, 2026, the
DMV will charge a fee of twenty-five dollars for such extract which will be directed to the DMV cash fund, up from
eighteen dollars. After July 1, 2026, the fee will be increased to thirty-five.
The DMV may make these searches available electronically. 
     Electronic searches of individual records will be accompanied by a fee of three dollars per record, up from one
dollar. Two dollars of that fee will be directed to the License Plate Fund and the remaining to the Records
Management Cash Fund. Bulk electronic searches for less than two thousand records will be accompanied by a fee
of fifty dollars, directed to the Records Management Cash Fund. Any searches over two thousand records will add an
additional fee of twenty-five dollars before July 1, 2026 and a fee off thirty-five dollars per one thousand records after
July 1, 2026. 
Section 3 – Amends section 60-1509 – Operator’s license services system 
The Operator’s License Services System Replacement and Maintenance Fund would be credited for all amounts
allocated under 60-483, not just subsection (8). 
Section 4 – The act becomes effective July 1, 2025. 
Section 5 repeals original sections.
Section 6 is an emergency clause.
 
Mike Moser, Chairperson
Committee Statement: LB114
Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Page 2 111e7fb7e73c956dfb72780a82632219