PREPARED BY: Suzanne Houlden LB 119 DATE PREPARED: January 24, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0057 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS See below See below Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB 119 seeks to codify the Rural Health Opportunity Program, also known as RHOP. RHOP is a collaborative educational initiative between the University of Nebraska Medical Center (UNMC) and the Nebraska State Colleges (NSCS). It was designed to address the healthcare needs of rural Nebraska by encouraging and financially supporting rural residents to pursue a career in a number of healthcare fields. The program first began in 1989 for Chadron State and Wayne State, with Peru State added in 2012. Students selected for the RHOP Program are pro vided an RHOP Tuition Waiver which fully covers the cost of tuition for all coursework completed at the State Colleges. They are also guaranteed admission to UNMC, provided all program requirements are met and the per-professional studies are completed. In order to ensure the RHOP “slots ” continue to be filled, NSCS also selects and financially supports a number of students as “RHOP Alternates”, who are offered slots if they become available through attrition or changes of major. The goal of the State College System is to cover 50% of tuition and fees for all RHOP slot recipients and alternatives by FY27. For FY25, about 71 students are projected to be in rotation, with the goal of reaching 110 students in FY26 and 150 by FY27. The FY25 base appropriation for this program is $600,000. According to NSCS, t he cost to achieve the by-FY27 goal is an additional $600,000 per year. The agency has a pending budget request for FY25-27 related to this increase over the upcoming biennium. This bill includes intent to appropriate sufficient funds for the program. If passed, LB 119 would require the University of Nebraska Medical Center (UNMC) to administer the program with a 0.20 FTE St udent Success Coordinator. The activities and responsibilities of the Coordinator are described in the University of Nebraska’ s fiscal note. The Fiscal Office has no basis to disagree with the Universit y’s stated cost of $24,906 for FY26 and $25,370 for FY27, with $10,000 each year designated for program -related travel expenses. It is assumed that the UNMC currently absorbs these costs as program coordination is already in effect. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 119 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska State College System REVIEWED BY: Kimberly Burns DATE: 01/16/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4171 COMMENTS: Agree with the Nebraska State College System’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 119. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 119 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: University of Nebraska System REVIEWED BY: Kimberl y Burns DATE: 01/22/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4171 COMMENTS: No reason to dispute the University of Nebraska System’s estimate of fiscal impact from LB 119. 0119Provide requirements for the Rural Health Opportunity Program and provide tuition waivers __________________________________ EXPENDITURESEXPENDITURES NUMBER OF POSITIONS Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) University of Nebraska System Prepared by: (3) Anne Barnes Date Prepared: (4) 01/17/2025 Phone: (5) (402) 559-6300 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025 - 26 FY 2026 - 27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS 24,906.00 0.00 CASH FUNDS 0.00 0.00 FEDERAL FUNDS 0.00 0.00 OTHER FUNDS 0.00 0.00 TOTAL FUNDS 24,906.00 0.00 EXPENDITURES REVENUE 25,370.00 0.00 0.00 0.00 0.00 0.00 0.00 0.00 25,370.00 0.00 Explanation of Estimate: LB0119, if passed, requires UNMC to administer the program with a .20 FTE Student Success Coordinator. This Student Success Coordinator in the College of Public Health works with undergraduate campus coordinators and the office of rural initiatives to admit and develop undergraduate PH-RHOP students and travels the undergraduate campuses to educate the undergraduate and high school student bodies on public health professions and recruit students from the respective campuses to the program. Once admitted, students participate in monthly development calls on leadership, career and graduate school readiness topics, and visit the UNMC two times for in-person and development sessions, during their undergraduate enrollment at the State Colleges. These activities are developed and supported by the College of Public Health Student Success and Pathways Program Coordinator. BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE Student Success Coordinator Benefits.............................................. Operating........................................... Travel................................................. Capital outlay.................................... Aid................................................... Capital improvements........................ TOTAL...................................... 25 - 26 1 0 26 - 27 1 0 2025 - 26 14,906.00 10,000.00 24,906.00 2026 - 27 15,370.00 10,000.00 25,370.00 Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 119 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education Prepared by: (3) Gary Timm Date Prepared: (4) 1/13/2025 Phone: (5) 402.471.0020 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: No Fiscal Impact _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...…………. . Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 119 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska State College System Prepared by: (3) Brenda Owen Date Prepared: (4) 1-15-25 Phone: (5) 402-471-2507 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: No fiscal impact. The legislation demonstrates an intent to provide ‘a sufficient amount of money for each fiscal year to carry out this section.’ Currently, the program is funded at $600,000 for FY25. The Nebraska State Colleges have submitted a 2025-2027 biennium budget request seeking to increase this funding by an additional $300,000 for both FY26 and FY27, raising the total funding to $900,000 and $1,200,000, respectively. Importantly, if the bill passes as drafted, there will be no fiscal impact. This is because the budget request and the bill were explicitly designed to function independently and are mutually exclusive in their fiscal implications. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… .....