Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB143 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/31/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Bill Biven, Jr. 
LB 143 DATE PREPARED: January 28, 2025 
PHONE: 	402--471-0054 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB143 amends §79-	215 to change the provisions relating to the preliminary enrollment in a school district by children of military 
families; to require any preliminary or advanced enrollment provisions of a school district apply to students with an individualized family 
service plan or individualized education program or students that receive special education. 
 
 
 
NO FISCAL IMPACT 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE B UDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE    
LB: 143                  AM:                        AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Education 
   
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns           DATE:  01/28/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
   
COMMENTS:  Concur with the Nebraska Department of Education’s assessment of no fiscal impact to the agency 
from LB 143. 
   
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE    
LB: 143                 AM:                 AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Military Department 
   
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns           DATE:  01/15/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
   
COMMENTS:  Concur with the Nebraska Military Department’s assessment of no fiscal impact to the agency 
from LB 143. 
   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 143 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Education 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Bryce Wilson/Brian 
Halstead 
Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/28/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4320 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact to NDE. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……… .    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 143 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
031 – Nebraska Military Department 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Lauren Hargreaves Date Prepared: 
(4)
 01/14/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-309-8120 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
 
CASH FUNDS 
 No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate:  
 
No Fiscal Impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
  
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
   
Benefits………………………………...……   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
Operating…………………………...……….   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
Travel………………………………………..   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
Capital outlay…………………...…………..   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
Aid…………………………………………...   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
Capital improvements……………………...   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact 
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   
No Fiscal 
Impact  
No Fiscal 
Impact