PREPARED BY: Nikki Swope LB 158 DATE PREPARED: January 28, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0042 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS See Below See Below Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political su bdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB 158 would require a health carrier or pharmacy benefit manager to include amounts paid by a health benefit plan enrollee or paid on behalf of an enrollee by another person for the purpose of calculating the enrollee's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or cost-sharing requirement under a health benefit plan. The bill has an enactment date of January 1, 2026. LB 158 would require third- party co-pay assistance payments to be applied to health plan participants out-of-pocket copays prior to offsetting plan costs. This would result in the reduction of co -pays paid by health plan participants but would result in increased health plan costs. Department of Administrative Services: LB 158 would result in an estimated health plan increase of $900,000 per plan year to the State of Nebraska. However, the State of Nebraska’s employee health plans utilize trust funds; thus, no additional appropriation is being requested. The State of Nebraska pays 79% of the premium costs for healthcare plans and employees pay the remaining 21% thus the increased cost is $355,500 in F Y 2025-26 for the partial year and $711,000 in FY 2026- 27. (79% of $900,000). Following is a breakdown of the total cost by funding types: Department of Administrative Services Fund Type Estimated Expenditures FY 2025-26 Estimated Expenditures FY 2026-27 General Fund $184,115 $368,230 Cash Fund $88,008 $176,016 Federal Fund $66,736 $133,471 Revolving Fund $16,641 $33,283 Total $355,500 $711,000 The impact of LB 158 would result in a health plan increase of $4,654 per plan year to the University. The University System pays 79% of the premium costs for healthcare plans and employees pay the remaining 21% thus the increased cost is $166,848 in FY 2025- 26 for the partial year and $33,696 in FY 2026-27. (79% of $42,654). Following is a breakdown of the total cost by funding types: University Systems Fund Type Estimated Expenditures FY 2025-26 Estimated Expenditures FY 2026-27 General Fund $6,334 $12,468 Cash Fund $3,538 $7,076 Federal Fund $674 $1,347 Revolving Fund $6,402 $12,805 Total $16,848 $33,696 ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ST ATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 158 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services REVIEWED BY: Ryan Walton DATE: 1/23/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4174 COMMENTS: The Department of Administrative Service’s assessment of fiscal impact from LB 158, appears reasonable. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 152 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Association of County Officials REVIEWED BY: Ryan Yang DATE: 1/15/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4178 COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska Association of County Officials assessment of fiscal impact from LB 152. Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 158 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – Employee Wellness & Benefits Prepared by: (3) Jennifer Norris Date Prepared: (4) 01/14/2025 Phone: (5) 402-471-4443 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS REVOLVING FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS See Below See Below See Below See Below Explanation of Estimate: LB 158 as introduced provides that for any health benefit plan entered into, amended, extended, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026, a health carrier or pharmacy benefit manager is to include any amount paid by a plan enrollee for purposes of calculating the enrollee’s overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or cost- sharing requirement under the plan. Implementation of LB 158 would end the Accumulator Adjustment Program for the State of Nebraska medical plans. Currently, manufacturer sponsored copay cards, coupons or rebates are applied towards pharmacy costs, then the actual amount covered by the employee is applied towards the member’s deductible and out-of-pocket maximum. Adding these outside payments allows the maximum to be reached sooner, leaving the State of Nebraska to cover the costs over the maximum. LB158 would increase the cost of the State of Nebraska medical plans by approximately $900,000 per plan year . The State’s health plans utilize trust funds; thus, no additional appropriation is being requested. As the State’s current medical plans are self-insured, an increase in claims would result in an increase in premium costs. The State pays 79% of the premium and the employee pays 21%. The changes proposed in LB 158 would impact the State’s and the employee’s premium costs. The State’s estimated impact is $355,500 in FY25- 26 and $711,000 in FY26 -27. ($900,000 in estimated increased costs x 79% = $711,000 ). The effective date of the bill is January 2026 – a partial fiscal year. The table below summarizes the estimated impact by fund type of any premium increases. The allocation by fund type is based on an average for Health Insurance expenditures over a five-year period (2020-2024). Fund Type Expenditures – FY25-26 Expenditures – FY26-27 General Fund $184,115 $368,230 Cash Fund $88,008 $176,016 Federal Fund $66,736 $133,471 Revolving Fund $16,641 $33,283 Total $355,500 $711,000 _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... 0158Provide requirements for health carriers or pharmacy benefit managers regarding out-of-pocket maximums and cost-sharing requirements __________________________________ EXPENDITURESEXPENDITURES NUMBER OF POSITIONS Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) University of Nebraska System Prepared by: (3) Anne Barnes Date Prepared: (4) 01/17/2025 Phone: (5) (402) 559-6300 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025 - 26 FY 2026 - 27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS 6,234.00 0.00 CASH FUNDS 3,538.00 0.00 FEDERAL FUNDS 674.00 0.00 OTHER FUNDS 6,402.00 0.00 TOTAL FUNDS 16,848.00 0.00 EXPENDITURES REVENUE 12,468.00 0.00 7,076.00 0.00 1,347.00 0.00 12,805.00 0.00 33,696.00 0.00 Explanation of Estimate: The University of Nebraska self-insured employee health insurance plan utilizes third party co-pay assistance programs to offset prescription drug costs to the health insurance plan. Legislative Bill 158 would require the third-party co-pay assistance payments to be applied to health plan participants out-of-pocket co-pays prior to offsetting plan costs. This would reduce health plan co-pays paid by the health plan participants and would increase plan costs. The fiscal impact is calculated based on calendar year 2024 activity. The total plan cost increase would be $42,654. The University pays 79% of the premiums and employee pays 21% of the premiums for the health insurance plan. The total annual fiscal impact to the University is $33,696 (79% of the $42,654 total annual cost). The requirements of the legislative bill would be on or after January 1, 2026. BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE Benefits.............................................. Operating........................................... Travel................................................. Capital outlay.................................... Aid................................................... Capital improvements........................ TOTAL...................................... 25 - 26 0 0 26 - 27 0 0 2025 - 26 16,848.00 16,848.00 2026 - 27 33,696.00 33,696.00