Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB172 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 172 DATE PREPARED: January 30, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0050 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 172 amends existing statutes related to child pornography.  
 
The bill expands the definition of child pornography to include computer-generated imagery indistinguishable from real children and 
replaces related terminology with "visual depictions of sexually explicit conduct involving minors."  
 
The bill criminalizes compelling a child to appear in such depictions and amends the Exploited Children’s Civil Remedy Act to include 
aiding in their creation or distribution. Penalties for repeat offenders are increased, with first-time violations by minors classified as 
Class III felonies, adults facing Class ID felonies, and repeat offenses resulting in Class IC felonies. Enhanced sent	encing applies to 
multiple sexual offenses, and forfeiture provisions are strengthened for assets used in these crimes. The bill also clarifies procedures 
for handling digital evidence, ensures law enforcement retains control while allowing controlled expe	rt review, expands judicial oversight 
on sentencing, and mandates pretrial hearings to determine if seized property was involved in a crime. 
 
The Supreme Court states a minimal fiscal impact from LB 172.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET D IVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 172              AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/4/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 172.     
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:   172                 AM:                           	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Attorney General 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   1/17/2025                                	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to dispute the Attorney General’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 172.   
  
   Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 172 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/2/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial educ	ation. No additional resources required. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....