Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB174 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/23/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 174 DATE PREPARED: January 22, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 174 amends statute by adding language regarding the maximum part of earnings that may be subject to garnishment 	for medical 
debt sought by medical debt buyers or medical creditors. 
. 
Section 1 also provides definitions for “Health 	care services”, “Medical debt”, Medical debt buyer”, and “Medical creditor”. 
 
No fiscal impact.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. 
RESPONSE 
 
LB:   174                  	AM:                              AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Nebraska Department of Labor 
 
REVIEWED BY:     Gary Bush                                   DATE:           01/21/2025                PHONE: (402) 
471-4161 
 
COMMENTS: Agree with the agency’s estimate of No Fiscal Impact.  
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. 
RESPONSE 
 
LB:   174                AM:                   AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Nebraska Department of Administrative 
Services 
 
REVIEWED BY:     Gary Bush                                   DATE:           01/22/2025               PHONE: (402) 
471-4161 
 
COMMENTS: Agree with the agency estimate of No Fiscal Impact.  
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 174 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – State 
Accounting 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Philip Olsen 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1.15.2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-0600 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 174 would provide a maximum of earnings to be garnished for medical debt sought by medical debt buyers or 
creditors.  
 
The Department of Administrative Servies (DAS) State Accounting believes LB	174 would require the courts to 
identify, in an interrogatory, garnishment requests that are for medical debt so the proper rule set could be applied. 
DAS-State Accounting would need to setup a rule set in the State A	ccounting System to be applied for medical 
debt garnishments. This is a one-	time setup process and is not expected to increase the garnishment workload.  
 
LB174 does not have a fiscal impact on Administrative Services. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 174 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Labor 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Rea Easton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/17/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-416-6809 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
There is no fiscal impact to the Nebraska Department of Labor for LB 174. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....