Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB208 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/23/2025

                    PREPARED BY: John Wiemer 
LB 208 DATE PREPARED: January 23, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0051 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS  $479,000  $741,000 
CASH FUNDS  $19,000  	$30,000 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS  $498,000  $771,000 
 
Any Fiscal Notes 	received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 208 adds to section 77-2708	(1)(d) if a model 1 seller’s sales and use tax functions are performed by a certified service provider and 
the certified service provider is compensated pursuant to the streamlined sales and use tax agreement (SSUTA) for performing such 
functions, then the model 1 seller shall not receive any collection f	ees that are specified in this subdivision. 
 
The bill adds “any other person” 	to be included in confidentiality requirements regarding sales tax. 
 
Under the bill, the SSUTA is updated to include amendments through December 31, 2024. 
 
LB 208 adds that there shall be allowed to qualified resident individuals against the income imposed by the Nebraska Revenue Act of 
1967 a refundable credit as provided in section 77-2703 for indi	viduals who qualify for an income tax credit under the Child 	Care Tax 
Credit Act for all taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, a change from all individuals. 
 
LB 208 adds that for purposes of the SSUTA, the data	base that assigns zip codes shall apply the lowest combined tax rate imposed in 
the nine-digit zip code area if the area includes more than one tax rate in any level of taxing juris dictions, and the database 	shall apply 
the highest combined tax rate imposed in the five-	digit zip code area if the area includes more than one tax 	rate in any level of taxing 
jurisdictions. 
 
LB 208 amends how credits are pro-rated when the credit limit is reached regarding the food donation credit and the Nebraska 
Biodiesel Tax Credit. 
 
The Department of Revenue (DOR) estimates the following increase to revenue as a result of this bill: 
 
 
 
There is estimated to be a revenue increase to the Highway Trust Fund and the Highway Allocation Fund, which is distributed to cities 
and counties. 
 
The DOR also estimates minimal costs to it to implement the bill. 
 
There is no basis to disagree with these estimates by the DOR. 
 
 
 
 
 
CONTINUED ON PAGE 2 
  LB 208 
PAGE 2 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 208              AM:                                    AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Revenue 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:  1/22/2025                                           	PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: The Department of Revenue assessment of fiscal impact from LB 208 appears reasonable. 
  
  LB 208 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 01/21/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds  $ 479,000   $ 741,000   $763,000 
Cash Funds  $19,000   $30,000   $31,000 
Federal Funds         
Other Funds  $ 3,000   $5,000   $5,000 
Total Funds  $ 501,000   $776,000   $799,000 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total…………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
 
LB 208 prohibits the sales tax collection fee for model 1 sellers that use a certified service provider (CSP) to 
perform the seller’s sales and use tax functions. The CSP already receives compensation from the state through 
contract provisions with the Streamlined Sales Tax Governing Board	.   
 
The bill adds the phrase “or any other person” when dealing with the confidentiality requirements for state sales 
tax.  This change mirrors the state income tax confidentiality law requirements	. 
 
The bill updates the ratification date for the streamlined sales and use tax agreement through December 31, 2024. 
Currently, it is ratified through December 31, 2015. 
 
LB 208 also adds language to the child tax credit, making the refundable 	tax credit only eligible to residents of 
the State of Nebraska 	like other refundable tax credits. 
 
The bill also changes the default state tax rate listed for the ZIP code in the state’s rate and boundary database if 
an incomplete address is used. 	Currently, the state defaults to the lowest state sales tax rate in the ZIP code. This 
bill changes that to the highest sales tax rate. If a nine-digit zip code is listed the rate will continue to default to 
the lowest sales tax rate in that ZIP code. 
 
Also, the bill makes changes in prorating tax credit limits for two 	income tax credits, food donation and Nebraska 
Biodiesel Tax Credit. Currentl	y, these credits are 	set up to allow donations through the entire year and require all 
donations to be prorated at the end of the year if the donations went above the donation cap. The new language 
states that no additional credits can be allowed after the credit limit is attained and donations that exceed the limit 
on the day the limit is reached will be prorated. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
  LB 208, page 2 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 
It is estimated that this bill will have the following 	impact on General Fund revenues: 
 
  
General Fund 
Revenues 
Highway 
Trust Fund 
Highway 
Allocation Fund 
FY25-26 479,000 19,000 3,000 
FY26-27 741,000 30,000 5,000 
FY27-28 763,000 31,000 5,000 
FY28-29 786,000 32,000 6,000 
 
It is estimated that there will be minimal costs to the Department of Revenue to implement this bill. 
 
The operative date for this bill is three months after adjournment of the Legislature.