Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB258 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/21/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 258 DATE PREPARED: February 03, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 258 changes future minimum wage increases from an increas	e in the cost-of-living to “the lesser of one and one-half percent, 
rounded to the nearest cent, or the increase in the cost-of-living.” This change takes place on January 1, 2027 and on January 1 of 
successive years. 
 
In addition, LB 258 allows employers to pay a youth minimum wage 	of thirteen dollars and fifty cents per hour ($13.50/ hour) to 
employees who are at least fourteen years of age, but younger than sixteen years of age and are not emanci pated minors. 
 
Section 2 allows employers to pay new employees who are at least sixteen but younger than eighteen and who are not seasonal or 
migrant workers or emancipated minors a training wage of $13.50/hour . 
 
The Department of Labor (DOL) estimates no fiscal impact from LB 258.  
 
DOL estimates appear to be reasonable	. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET D IVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 258              AM:                                 AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Labor 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE: 2/20/2025                                          PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Labor assessment of no fiscal impact to the agency from LB 258. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 258                AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – Employee 
                                                                                                    Relations 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                    DATE: 2/13/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: Concur with the DAS assessment of indeterminate fiscal impact from LB 258. 
  
.  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 258 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – Employee 
Relations 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Dan Birdsall 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/16/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-802-6689 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
This bill amends the Wage and Hour Act by defining the yearly increase of minimum wage beginning January 1, 
2027, and subsequent years.  The minimum wage increase will be the lesser of 1.5% or the increase in the cost of 
living. This bill also makes changes to minimum wage payments to minors and training wages. 
 
It is not clear whether this bill would have a fiscal impact on the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) and it 
cannot be reasonably estimated.  The Wage and Hour Act does not apply to the State, but the State is impacted by 
the market conditions that are affected by changes to the Wage and Hour Act. 
 
However, the fiscal impact would only exist when the cost	-of-living increase was higher than 1.5%. These variables 
cannot be reasonably predicted 	at this point. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26              26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 258 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Labor 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Rea Easton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-416-6809 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
There is no fiscal impact to the Nebraska Department of Labor for LB 258. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....