PREPARED BY: Suzanne Houlden LB 299 DATE PREPARED: February 05, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0057 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS See below See below Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB 299 allows eligible aliens to receive public benefits related to employment and retirement. The only agency reporting a fiscal impact is the Nebraska Department of Labor (NDOL), who explains that historically, up to 300 individuals per year were denied unemployment insurance benefits because of citizenship status. N DOL asserts that additional individuals in Nebraska could now apply for unemployment insurance benefits who would not have applied before, and that this amount is unknown. NDOL uses the assumption of 300 applicants and average weekly benefit for 202 4 ($451.45), combined with the average claim duration of approximately 12 weeks, to arrive at its estimated increase in payments of $1,625,220. NDOL further explains that the agency would need to implement business process changes but does not anticipate technology costs. The source of the insurance benefits payments would be Trust funds, and the agency explains that current Trust funds balances will support this increase. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 299 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Labor REVIEWED BY: Ryan Yang DATE: 2/6/2025 PHONE: (402) 471- 4178 COMMENTS: The Nebraska Department of Labor assessment of fiscal impact from LB 299 appears reasonable. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 299 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – State Personnel REVIEWED BY: Ryan Yang DATE: 2/1/2025 PHONE: (402) 471- 4178 COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Department of Administrative Services assessment of no fiscal impact to the agency from LB 299. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 299 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems REVIEWED BY: Gary Bush DATE: 01/23/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4161 COMMENTS: Agree with the agency’s estimate of No Fiscal Impact. Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 299 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – State Personnel Prepared by: (3) Sean Davis Date Prepared: (4) 1/17/25 Phone: (5) 402-471-4439 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS REVOLVING FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: LB 299 requires provision of public benefits, including employment benefits, to eligible aliens. This includes retirement benefits under the State Employees Retirement Act, the Employment Security Law, deferred compensation under section 84- 1504, scholarships or financial aid for education, and any other benefit relating to employment, including what would apply to the eligible alien’s family members or dependents. State agencies would be required to maintain an approved identification document for each individual as outlined in this bill. In Section 4, the Department of Administrative Services ( DAS) is required to prescribe a format for individuals applying for public benefits to attest to their eligible alien status. Aliens with employment authorization currently employed by the State of Nebraska have access to employment benefits. There is no identified fiscal impact to the Department of Administrative Services. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 299 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska Department of Labor Prepared by: (3) Rea Easton Date Prepared: (4) 2/5/2025 Phone: (5) 402-416-6809 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS TRUST FUNDS 1,625,220 1,625,220 TOTAL FUNDS 1,625,220 1,625,220 Explanation of Estimate: As proposed, LB 299 expands unemployment insurance benefits to eligible aliens. Historically, up to 300 individuals per year were denied unemployment insurance benefits because of citizenship status. The Nebraska Department of Labor believes additional individuals in Nebraska may not have applied for unemployment insurance benefits because they knew they would not be eligible. Because the number is unknown, NDOL is estimating an additional 300 people would have received benefits each year going forward. The average weekly benefit amount for 2024 was $451.45 and the average claim duration was approximately 12 weeks. The Nebraska Department of Labor anticipates it will pay out $1,625,220 more ($451.45 * 12 * 300) in unemployment insurance benefits each year. NDOL would need to implement business process changes but does not anticipate any technology costs. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 299 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems (NPERS)- 085 Prepared by: (3) Teresa Zulauf Date Prepared: (4) 1/23/25 Phone: (5) 402-471-7745 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS 0 0 0 0 FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS 0 0 0 0 Explanation of Estimate: LB 299- Allow Eligible aliens to receive public benefits relating to employment. No fiscal impact to NPERS Agency 085 operations expenditures. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… .....