Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB304 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Mikayla Findlay 
LB 304 DATE PREPARED: February 4, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0062 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS $10,743,449  $14,324,599  
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS $10,743,449  $14,324,599  
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
This bill changes provisions of the Child Care Subsidy program, remov ing the October 1, 2026 sunset on the eligibility cap of 185% of 
the Federal Poverty Level (FPL). The bill also removes the October 1, 2026 sunset on 	eligibility for transitional Child Care Subsidy of 
200% FPL. Currently, the income cap wou	ld revert to the threshold of 130% FPL for regular subsidy and 185% for transitional subsidy.  
 
The Department of Health and Human Services (DHHS), the administering agency, cites internal data that a total of 4,858 families 
qualified under expanded eligibility since August 2021 following the passage of LB485. DHHS indicates an average of 2,033 families 
claim subsidy each month. The average monthly subsidy expense per family is $587.17 or $ 7,046.04 annual ly. Without accounting for 
annual growth this amounts to $14,324,599 	in increased aid expenditures. The FY26 impact represents 75% of the state 	fiscal year as 
the agency is responsible for implementation of the expanded eligibility through the first quarter of FY26. 
 
Unlike in previous fiscal years, D	HHS does not have federal funds available to offset the added costs of maintaining the expanded 
eligibility. In 2023, DHHS noted in the fiscal note for LB227, which most recently extended the expanded Child Care Subsidy eligibility 
provisions : “if federal grant funding changes, general funds may be needed to cover a portion or the totality of this aid cost.” At this point 
in time, expenses for the Child Care Subsidy program exceed the amount of federal funds available therefore any additional aid costs 
would necessitate additional General Funds.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE    
LB:        30 4           AM:                              	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services 
   
REVIEWED BY:       Ann Linneman                                	DATE:       2 -5-2025                  PHONE: (402) 471-4180 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services’ assessment of fiscal impact.   
  
   
  
   
 
LB (1) 304 FISCAL NOTE 	2025 
 
 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
State Agency or Political Subdivision Name:(2) Department of Health and Human Services 
Prepared by: (3) John Meals 	Date Prepared 2-3-25 	Phone: (5) 471-6719 
 	FY 2025-2026  	FY 2026-2027 
 	EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS $14,326,996   $14,326,996  
CASH FUNDS      
FEDERAL FUNDS 
     
OTHER FUNDS 
     
TOTAL FUNDS 
$14,326,996 	$0  $14,326,996 	$0 
 
 
Return by date specified or 72 hours prior to public hearing, whichever is earlier. 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB304 changes the provisions relating to the Child Care Subsidy assistance. It removes the sunset date 	of October 1
st
, 
2026, and extends it indefinitely while keeping the initial eligibility determination and transitional/	redetermination the same. 
This bill does not require any further regulations updates. 
 
With the enactment and implementation of LB485 in August 2021, which temporarily changed the C	hild Care Subsidy 
initial eligibility income limits from 130% Federal Poverty Level (FPL) to 185% FPL and the redetermination/transitional 
eligibility income limits from 185% FPL to 200% FPL, the sunset date 	was scheduled to end October 1, 2023. However, in 
2023, with the passing of LB227, the sun set date was extended to October 1
st
, 2026. LB304 proposes to remove that 
sunset date which would leave the eligibility income limits as they are now.  
 
Since the inception of LB485, 4,858 families have become eligible for child care subsidy with the expanded eligibility. 
There has been an average of 2,033 families that have billed each month. The average monthly child care cost of each 
newly eligible family is $587.17 per month. The annual cost of this is $14,326,996 assuming no annual growth.  
 
The Department of Health and Human Services (DHHS) utilized American Rescue Plan Act (ARPA) fun	ding to pay for the 
increased costs for LB485 (2021) and LB227 (2023) through the expiration of that funding on September 30, 2024. 
Current child care subsidy costs exceed the annual value of the child care grants. Since available federal funds are 
already being utilized, state general funds will need to be appropriated to cover the cost of this program moving forward.  
 
MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
 
 
PERSONAL SERVICES: 
 	NUMBER OF POSITIONS 2025-2026 	2026-2027 
POSITION TITLE 	26-26 26-27 EXPENDITURES EXPENDITURES 
 
   
 
   
 
   
 
   
 
   
Benefits............................................................................................................................... 
  
Operating............................................................................................................................ 
  
Travel.................................................................................................................................. 
  
Capital Outlay..................................................................................................................... 
  
Aid...................................................................................................................................... 
$14,326,996 $14,326,996 
Capital Improvements......................................................................................................... 
  
                   TOTAL............................................................................................................ 
$14,326,996 $14,326,996