Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB322 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/22/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 322 DATE PREPARED: April 16, 2025 
PHONE: 	471-0050  
    
Revision: 01  
Update with AM 767  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 322 relates to the Nebraska Criminal Code.  
 
The bill expands protections for pharmacists by including them under Nebraska’s assault laws. It also updates assault classifications, 
adjusts penalties, and removes outdated provisions affecting public safety officers, emergency responders, and healthcare workers. 
 
AM767 replaces the entirety of LB322, adding specific clarifications and e	xpansions.  
 
The amendment broadens the definition of "health care professional" to explicitly include all hospital and health clinic employees, rather 
than limiting it to licensed practitioners. It clarifies the definitions for emergency care providers and pharmacists as originally stated in 
LB322.  
 
The classifications and penalties for assaults (first, second, and third degree) remain unchanged, but the amendment provides clearer 
distinctions regarding the roles protected under the statute. Additionally, the amendment retains requirements for healthcare facilities to 
display signage indicating the penalties for assaults. Lastly, provisions related to assaults involving bodily fluids remain consistent with 
LB322. 
 
The Supreme Court states that providing judicial education has a minimal fiscal impact. 
 
The Nebraska Department of Correctional 	Services (NDCS) states that LB 322 could increase the prison population, ho	wever at this 
time that amount is indeterminable.  
 
It is difficult to provide an exact estimate of the fiscal impact at this time, as current data under existing law is not readily accessible. 
However, to see a substantial increase in state expenditures due to incarceration costs resulting from LB322 and AM767, the number of 
individuals incarcerated would need to be 	significant. 
 
 Historically, legislation that incrementally expands protected categories has resulted in modest cost increases, unless there's a 
substantial uptick in enforcement, reporting, prosecution, and convictions. 
 
 
 
 
 ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVIS ION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 322                   AM: 767                          	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                          DATE:    4/17/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 322 AM 767.   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 322 AM767 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Correctional Services 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Lisa Stanton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 04/17/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 (402)479-5702 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
The bill could increase 	the number of persons in prison.  The specific amount of impact is 
indeterminable.
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………. ..    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 322, AM767 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 4/16/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB322, as amended by AM767, would have a minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial education. No additional 
resources required. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL………… …………………… .....