Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB373 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/28/2025

                      
 
 
PREPARED BY: Shelly Glaser 
LB 373 DATE PREPARED: January 27, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0052 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legi	slative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB373 amends Nebraska §39-1722, 39-1724, 39-17253, and 39-1410 to allow county boards the authority to vacate or abandon public 
roads that are section lines, if they feel the road is not in the public’s best interest.  After a Highway Superintendent (or similarly directed 
person) recommends the abandonment, then a public hearing would be held.  The advanced notice of the hearing’s time, date, and 
place would be published for three consecutive weeks in a legal newspaper of the county (or one 	generally circulated in that county), 
with a clear description of the road being proposed to vacate.  Additionally, the advanced hearing notice is to be sent by mail to 	owners 
of the land abutting on or adjacent to the road, whenever possible. 
 
 
The Nebraska Department of Transportation (NDOT) has indicated no 	fiscal impact. 
 
The Nebraska Association of County Officials (NACO) is anticipating a minimal fiscal impact to counties. 
 
There is no basis to disagree with these estimations of fiscal impact to NDOT or NACO. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 373               AM:                                            AGENCY/PO LT. SUB: : Nebraska Department of Transportation 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/28/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Nebraska Department of Transportation’s assessment of no net fiscal impact from LB 373 appears 
reasonable. 
   
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:  373                 AM:                              AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Association of C	ounty Officials 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/28/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: The Nebraska Association of County Officials assessment of minimal fiscal impact from LB 373 appears 
reasonable.  
   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1)  373 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Association of County Officials (NACO) 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Elaine Menzel Date Prepared: 
(4)
  1/21/2024 Phone: 
(5)
 402.434.5660 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2024-25 	FY 2025-26 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB373 would change provisions relating to section lines and vacation or abandonment of public roads.
 No 
road study would be required to be conducted for a vacation or abandonment under the proposed changes 
under LB373. 
 
The fiscal impact of LB373 is expected to be a minimal reduction to counties. 
 
 
 
______________________________________________ 	_BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITU	RE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
24-25               25-26 
2024-25 
EXPENDITURES 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 373 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Transportation 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jenessa Boynton Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-479-4691 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 373 proposes to change provisions relating to the perpetuation of existing government corners.  In addition, 
the bill changes provisions relat	ed to vacation or abandonment of public roads.  
 
No fiscal impact is anticipated to the Department.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPEN	DITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements…………………… ...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....