Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB384 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/12/2025

                    PREPARED BY: John Wiemer 
LB 384 DATE PREPARED: February 12, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0051 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 384 amends the Property Tax Request Act. 
 
The bill changes requirements needing to be meet if any political subdivision seeks to increase its property tax request by more than 
the allowable growth percentage. The bill changes section 77-1633 (3)(b) so at least a majority of the elected members, a change from 
one elected official, of the governing body of each participating political subdivision shall attend the joint public hearing under the Act. 
 
No fiscal impact to the state. 
 
The Nebraska Association of County Officials notes that coordinating schedules among the officials increases the possibility of not 
complying with the Act, which would then cause the political subdiv	ision’s property tax request to revert back to the prior year’s request. 
 
 
TECHNICAL NOTE: Section 77-1633 (3)(a) states that each such political subdivision shall designate one representative 	to attend the 
joint public hearing on behalf of the political subdivision. This would need to be changed in the bill to harmonize the language in the Ac	t 
to provide for a majority of elected members to attend the joint public hearing rather than one representative. 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 384            AM:                                       AGENCY/POLT. SUB: County of Lancaster 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE:  2/3/2025                                           	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the County of Lancaster assessment of fiscal impact from LB 384    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 384              AM:                                 AGENCY/POLT. SUB: City of Lincoln 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE: 1/28/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: The City of Lincoln assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 384 appears reasonable. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 384                        AM:                       AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Association of County Officials 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                    DATE: 1/28/2025                                            	PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska Association of County Officials assessment of LB 384. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 384 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
City of Lincoln  
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Claire Oglesby Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/24/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402.441.8301 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
 
Minimal to no fiscal impact.  
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 384 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Association of County Officials 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Elaine Menzel Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/22 /2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402.434.5660 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB384 would require a majority of the county board (elected officials) and other members of the joint entity 
members whose duties are outlined under the Property Tax Request Act to attend the joint meeting.  
 
Coordinating schedules will increase the possibility of not complying with the Property Tax Request Act, which 
would cause the political subdivision’s property tax request to revert back to the prior year’s request. 
 
 _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 384 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
County of Lancaster 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) David Derbin, Chief 
Administrative Officer 
Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/21/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-441-6865 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....