Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB394 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/03/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Clinton Verner 
LB 394 DATE PREPARED: January 25, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0056 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – 	STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS  See below  See below 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS  See below  See below 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB394 would make the following 	modifications to the 	the fee schedule under the Weights and Measure Act: 
 
Min Max Mi n Max
Scales
Up through 35 pounds capacity7.96$      14.34$    37.00$    43.00$    
Multiunit Scales 51.00$    80.37$    169.00$  196.00$  
Over 35 through 1,000 pounds ca15.13$    25. 35$    59.00$    68.00$    
Over 1,000 through 4,000 pounds 31.87$    51. 03$    110.00$  127.00$  
Over 4,000 through 50,000 pound 36.65$    58. 36$    125.00$  144.00$  
Over 50,000 through 150,000 pou 39.04$    62. 03$    132.00$  153.00$  
Over 150,000 pounds capacity86.87$    135.40$  279.00$  323.00$  
Length Measuring Devices:
Cordage or fabric 16.56$    27.55$    63.00$    73.00$    
Pumps
Service Station Dispensers—per  5.09$      9. 94$      28.00$    32.00$    
High-capacity service station dis   17.52$    29. 02$    66.00$    77.00$    
Compressed natural gas—per di 91.65$    142. 74$  294.00$  340.00$  
Meters
Vehicle tank meters 14.17$    23.88$    56.00$    65.00$    
Loading rack meters 31.87$    51.03$    110.00$  128.00$  
Liquid petroleum gas meters40.00$    63.50$    135.00$  157.00$  
Liquid fertilizer and herbicide m36.65$    58. 36$    125.00$  145.00$  
Liquid feed meters 36.65$    58.36$    125.00$  145.00$  
Cryogenic	53.39$    84.04$    176.00$  204.00$  
Mass Flow Metering Systems: 
Mass flow meters (all liquid)78.26$    122.19$  252.00$  293.00$  
Electric vehicle chargers	294.00$  340.00$  
Current LB394
 
 
 
CONTINUED ON PAGE 2  LB 394 
PAGE 2 
 
No basis to disagree with revenue 	estimates as provided by the Department of Agric	ulture based upon their assumptions, however the 
fee set is up to the discretion of the Director of Agriculture. LB394 creates an additional fee on electric vehicle chargers. 
Disagree with the Department’s expenditure estimates as LB394 creat es no additional duties. Any authority to expend revenue resulting 
from this legislation would be subject to the appropriations process. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:  394                AM:                              AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
   
REVIEWED BY:  Joe Massey                      DATE: 1/24/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Agriculture’s assessment of impact from the transfer articulated 
in LB 394 
   
    
 
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 394 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Ashley Dempsey Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/21/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-429-2487 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
(838,000)   (838,000)   
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
838,000  838,000  838,000  838,000 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  838,000  0  838,000 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
The bill increases the ceiling for annual permit and inspection fees set by the Director each year on or before 
July 1. 
 
The current statutory ceiling was last increased in 2003 and pursuant to the statutory formula, the fees have 
been at the maximum since July 1, 2023. The existing statutory fees were established so that the Weights and 
Measures Inspection Program costs were funded by approximately a 50/50 General Fund match with the fee 
revenues. The ceiling increase will allow fees to be set at a higher rate thereby decreasing the burden on the 
General Fund. The estimation provided here is based on setting the fees for July 1, 2025, at an amount 
sufficient to eliminate the General Fund from the program’s budget for FY2025-26 and subsequent fiscal years. 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid………………………………………	…...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   0  0