Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB395 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/26/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 395 DATE PREPARED: March 24, 2025 
PHONE: 	471-0050  
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 	$127,836  $121,143  
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS 	$127,836  $121,143  
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB395 imposes stricter limitations on firearm possession by certain juveniles, including those with sealed felony or domestic violence 
adjudications, until they reach age 25 or receive a court-issued exemption. It further specifies that law enforcement may review sealed 
records whenever an individual under 25 applies for a concealed-	carry permit or handgun-	purchase certificate, ensuring no loopholes 
exist for acquiring firearms. Consequently, agencies involved in juvenile record management or firearm oversight—such as law 
enforcement, juvenile courts, and applicable state departments—must implement updated procedures for notifying juveniles, sealing 
records, and verifying firearm prohibitions. 
 
The Supreme Court has stated that LB 395 will have a minimal fiscal impact and will not require any additional resources.  
 
The Nebraska State Patrol estimates it will need two additional FTE (an Administrative Technician and a Crime Analyst) to research, 
review, and report the sealed records required under LB395, given that no current mechanism exists to submit prohibiting juvenile 
information to the FBI’s Interstate Identification Index (III) or the NICS Indices. This process would require changes to Nebraska 
Revised Statute 43-	252 to allow fingerprints to be transmitted to the III and a separate system to address non-fingerprinted offenses. 
Additional operating expenses—supplies, OCIO costs, and computer leases—are projected at $5,352 for FY 2026 and $5,532 for FY 
2027, with one-time capital outlays of $10,240 in FY 2026 for computer hardware and office furniture. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:   395                  AM:                        AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:  3/25/2025                                 	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 395.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 395                   AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Patrol 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   2/21/2025                                	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the State Patrol’s estimated fiscal impact as a result of LB 395.    
   Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 395 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska State Patrol 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Carol Aversman Date Prepared: 
(4)
 02/14/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4545 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
$127,836   $121,143  
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$127,836   $121,143  
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 395, Section 2 (3) (h) (i) allows for a sealed record to be access	ible to law enforcement to determine if a 
person under the age of 25 years has been previously adjudicated for an act which would constitute a felony or 
a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence as defined in subsection (6) of section 28-1204.05 when such 
person applies for a permit under the Concealed Handgun Permit Act or a certificate to purchase, lease, rent, 
or transfer a handgun under section 69-2401, et seq.  
 
Section 28- 1204.05 states that a person under the age of 25 years who knowingly possesses a firearm 
commits the offense of possession of a firearm by a prohibited juvenile offender if he or she has previously 
been adjudicated an offender in juvenile court for an act which would constitute a felony or an act which would 
constitute a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence.  This includes an offense for which a juvenile record has 
been sealed upon termination of probation.   
 
The State Patrol estimates that in order to research, review, and appropriately report the sealed records 
described in Section 2 (3) (h) (i) of the bill for firearm disqualification purposes	, it will need an additional 2 full 
time employees (an Administrative Technician and a Crime Analyst). There are curr	ently no mechanisms in 
place to report prohibiting juvenile records to either the FBI’s Interstate Identification Index (III) or the NICS 
Indices for nationwide availability during firearm background checks. Nationwide availability is crucial because 
the FBI conducts Nebraska’s long gun background checks.   
 
The mechanism to retrieve juvenile adjudications from the Administrative Office of the Courts would need to be 
established for fingerprinted juvenile offenses to appear on the criminal history record or III.  It’s important to 
note Nebraska Rev. Stat. 43-252 would need to be amended to allow the Nebraska State Patrol to send 
juvenile fingerprints to the III.  Furthermore, for juvenile offenses that weren’t fingerprinted, a mechanism to 
report the prohibiting information to the NICS Indices would need to be developed 	and implemented.   
 
Additional costs include operational expenses (OCIO costs, supplies, and computer leases) totaling $5,352 in 
FY 26 and $5,532 in FY 27.  Capital outlays include the one-	time costs of purchasing computer monitors, 
document scanners and office furniture/cubicles for the new employees.  These total $10,240 	in FY 26. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
   
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
Administrative Technician (CID) 1 1 $37,488  $38,612 
State Patrol Crime Analyst (CID) 1 1 $45,378  $46,740 
Benefits………………………………...……   $29,378  $30,259 
Operating…………………………...……….   $5,352  $5,532 
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..   $10,240  
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   $127,836  $121,143 
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 395 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 3/21/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial and staff education. No additional resources required. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits……………………………… ...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....