Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB397 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/21/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 397 DATE PREPARED: February 19, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 397 repeals the Workplace Safety Consultation Program and harmonizes provisions within Nebraska Statutes.  
 
The requirement of safety committees for public and private employers subject to the Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act is 
eliminated under LB 397.   
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  397           AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Labor 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:  2/20/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Labor assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 397. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:   397            AM:                      AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Nebraska Department of Administrative Services 
 
REVIEWED BY:     	Gary Bush                                  	DATE:           01/27/2025                	PHONE: (402) 471-4161 
 
COMMENTS: Agree with the agency estimate of No Fiscal Impact.  
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:   397                  AM:                      AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Court 
 
REVIEWED BY:     	Gary Bush                                   	DATE:           01/27/2025               	PHONE: (402) 471-4161 
 
COMMENTS: Agree with the agency estimate of No Fiscal Impact.  
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 397 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – Risk 
Management 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Sarah Skinner Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/22/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-419-4229 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
See Below    See Below   
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
LB 397 proposes to repeal the Workplace Safety Consultation Program, eliminating the 	requirement of a safety 
committee for public and private employers subject to the Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act. The State of 
Nebraska statewide safety committee does not receive funding. 
 
LB 397 has no fiscal impact to the Department of Administrative Services	.  
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 397 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Labor 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Rea Easton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-416-6809 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
There is no fiscal impact to the Nebraska Department of Labor for LB 397. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 397 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Court 
                                 Court Administrator 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jill G. Schroeder Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 24, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402.471.3602 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No Fiscal Impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits……………… ………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid………………………………………	…...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....