Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB411 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/07/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Bill Biven, Jr. 
LB 411 DATE PREPARED: March 05, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0054 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS $137,439,500  SEE BELOW  
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS $137,439,500  SEE BELOW  
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB411 amends §79-	8,114 to change provisions relating to eligibility for reten	tion grants. 
 
The Nebraska Department of Education (NDE) will distribute all retention grants automatically to the school district employing the 
eligible teacher. The district 	will then distribute the grant funds to that teacher. 
 
Prior to July 1, 2025: 
• a retention one grant of $2,500 if the teacher has signed a contract to complete that teacher's second complete school year of 
full-time employment 
• a retention two grant of $2	,500 if the teacher has signed a contract to complete that teacher's fourth complete school year of 
full-time employment as a teacher 
• a retention three grant of $2,500 	if the teacher has signed a contract to complete 	that teacher's sixth complete school year of 
full-time employment as a teacher 
 
Beginning July 1, 2025: 
• a retention grant of $2,500 per school year for a teacher's first through sixth school year of full-time employment teaching at a 
Nebraska school 
• a retention grant of $ 3,000 per school year for a teacher's seventh through fifteenth school year of full-time employment 
teaching at a Nebraska school 
• a retention grant of $ 4,000 per school year for a teacher's sixteenth & each year thereafter of full-time employment teaching at 
a Nebraska school 
 
A high- need retention grant of $5,000 if on or after July 1, 2025, a teacher: 
• obtains an endorsement in special education, mathematics, science, technology, or dual	-credit 
• signs a contract to complete a year of full-time employment as a teacher to teach in that endorsement area at a Nebraska 
school 
 
A teacher can only obtain one high-need grant during t he duration of their teacher career in Nebrask a.  
 
 
Since an emergency exists, this bill takes effect when passed & 	approved according to law. 
 
 
 
FISCAL IMPACT: 
For FY2025-26, NDE estimates that there are twenty	-seven thousand four hundred & eighty-eight retention grant eligible teachers in 
Nebraska. Of th ose teachers, nine thousand five hundred & eighty-nine are eligible for a high needs grant as well. 
 
For FY2026-27, the estimate would be less than FY2025-26 but cannot be determined as there isn’t a way to estimate the number of 
new & or retiring teachers & also how many of those new teachers will also be eligible for the high-need grant . 
 
 
 
  ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE  
LB: 411                  AM:                          AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Education 
 
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns           DATE:  03/06/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
 
COMMENTS:  The Department of Education’s estimate of fiscal impact from LB 411 appears reasonable based on the 
assumptions applied. 
 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE  
LB: 411                  AM:                    AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems 
 
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns          DATE:  02/02/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
 
COMMENTS:  Concur with the Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems’ assessment of no fiscal impact 
resulting from LB 411. 
 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 411 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Education 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Lane Carr 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1.29.25 Phone: 
(5)
 402.419.3012 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
$137,439,500    $90,000,000   
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$137,439,500    $90,000,000   
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
LB411 would amend the Teacher Recruitment and Retention Act to automatically distribute funding to school 
districts employing eligible teachers. Eligibility and amounts are extended to the following:  
• Teachers in their first thru sixth years - $2,500 each year 
• Teachers in their seventh thru fifteenth years - $3,000 each year 
• Techers with 16 or more years of service - $4,000 each year  
 
Additionally, high-	need retention grants of $5,000 are provided to teachers who obtain an endorsement in 
special education, mathematics, science, technology, or dual credit. Such high-	need retention grants are only 
awarded once.  
 
Breakdown of Teachers by Years of Service	:  
Teachers Public/ESU Nonpublic Total Number Amount 
1-6 Years 7024 737 7761 $19,402,500 
7-15 Years 7966 850 8816 $26,448,000 
16+ Years 9692 1219 10911 $43,644,000 
Total: $89,494,500 
 
High Need  
 	Public/ESU Nonpublic Total: Amount 
SPED 	5546 324 
 
Sci & Tech 3343 376 
Dual Credit 20 2 
Total * 	5870 3719 9589 $47,945,000 
*Some teachers hold multiple of these high-	need areas.  
 After the high need grants are awarded, it is difficult to anticipate how many new high need teachers would be 
added each year, though it would be significantly less than the first year.   
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
       
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...   $137,439,500   $90,000,000  
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   $137,439,500   $90,000,000  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 411 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems (NPERS)-
085 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Teresa Zulauf Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-7745 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
LB 411 – Changes to Teacher Recruitment and Retention Act. 
 
No fiscal impact to NPERS Agency 085 operations expenditures. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....