Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB451 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/21/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 451 DATE PREPARED: January 30, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS  See Below  See Below 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS  See Below  See Below 
TOTAL FUNDS  See Below  See Below 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 451 requires a t ransfer of any balance in excess of $1,000,000 in the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund on or before No	vember 1 each 
year beginning in 2025 through 2034.  The first 	$1,000,000 transferred shall be to the Capitol Restoration Cash Fund.  Any remaining 
balance shall be transferred to the Permanent School Fund. 
 
Current practice is that any Unclaimed Pro	perty Trust Fund balance in excess of $1 million is transferred to the Permanent School 
Fund. 
 
The net effect of LB 451 is that from 2025 through 2034, the Permanent School fund will re	ceive $1,000,000 less per year for a total of 
$10,000,000.  The Capitol Restoration 	Cash Fund will receive those funds. 
 
The Department of Administrative Services (DAS) estimates $1,000,000 of revenue 	per year coming into the Capitol Restoration Cash 
Fund.  This estimate is accurate, per the provisions o	f LB 451. DAS also estimates $1,000,000 of expenditures in their fiscal note 
response.  LB 451 is silent regarding additional expenditures from the fund; the bill only requires the aforementioned transfers.  For this 
reason, the DAS estimate of $1,000,000 per year from the Capitol Restoration Cash Fund is not included in the 	table above. 
 
The Treasurer estimates no fiscal impact.  The net fiscal impact of LB 451 is $0. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 451                 AM:                           AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Treasurer 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                DATE: 1/30/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: The State Treasurer’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 451, appears reasonable. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 451                 AM:                          AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services (DAS) 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                DATE: 2/12/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: DAS’ assessment of fiscal impact from LB 451, appears reasonable. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 451 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) Office of the 
Capitol Commission (OCC) 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Ann Martinez 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/4/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4135 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
$1,000,000   $1,000,000   $1,000,000   $1,000,000 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$1,000,000   $1,000,000   $1,000,000   $1,000,000 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 451 provides that on or before November 1
st
 of each year beginning in 2025 through 2034, the Treasurer shall 
transfer any balance in excess of one million dollars from the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund as follows: 
 
The first one million dollars – (less any costs related to unclaimed property) to the Capitol Restoration Cash Fund; 
and any remaining balance to the permanent school fund. 
 
Expenditures from the fund will be prescribed by the administrator and approved by the commission.  
 
An A- Bill would be necessary for a cash fund appropriation of one million dollars in order to spend this funding 
annually. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….   $1,000,000   $1,000,000  
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   $1,000,000   $1,000,000  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 451 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
State Treasurer 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jason Walters Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 29, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-2793 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
The State Treasurer’s Office doesn’t expect any fiscal impact from LB 4	51 to the Treasurer ’s office. However, 
the permanent school fund would receive $1,000,000 less in the transfer from the Unclaimed Property Trust 
Fund every year between 2025 – 2034 and the Capitol Restoration Cash Fund would receive $1,000,000 more 
every year between 2025 – 2034. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL ………………………………...	..