Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB461 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/06/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Bill Biven, Jr. 
LB 461 DATE PREPARED: February 04, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0054 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB461 amends §16-	1027 to change provisions relating to retiring firefighters. 
 
For any firefighter whose retirement date is on or after January 1, 1997, the optional benefit forms for the retirement system wi	ll include 
annual payments, quarterly payments, monthly payments, or a single lump-	sum payment of the firefighter's retirement value. 
 
NO FISCAL IMPACT. 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & PO LT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 461             AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Revenue 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/5/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Revenue’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 461.   
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 461                   AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    1/29/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems’ estimate of no fiscal impact as a result 
of LB 461. 
   
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 461                     AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: City of Kearney 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    1/29/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the City of Kearney’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 461.    
  
DMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 461                  AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: City of Norfolk 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    1/29/2025                              	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the City of Norfolk’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 461.    
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 461 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
City of Kearney 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Brad DeMers 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/28/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 308-233-3210 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
--   --  
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
The enactment of the bill would not have a fiscal effect. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating………………………… ...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 461 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
City of Norfolk 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Randy Gates 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/29/25 Phone: 
(5)
 (402)844-2011 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No Fiscal Impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITU	RE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 461 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems (NPERS)-
085 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Teresa Zulauf Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/28/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-7745 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
LB 461 – Changes provisions of the Cities of the First Class firefighters Retirement Act. 
 
No fiscal impact to NPERS Agency 085 operations expenditures. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26              26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  LB 461 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 02/04/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds  $ 0   $ 0   $ 0 
Cash Funds         
Federal Funds         
Other Funds         
Total Funds  $ 0   $ 0   $ 0 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total…………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
 
LB 461 requires the retirement system to include the following optional benefit forms to firefighter who retire 
after January 1, 1997: annual payments, quarterly payments, or monthly payments. 
It is estimated that LB 461 will have no impact on the General Fund revenues. 
It is estimated that there will be no costs to the Department of Revenue to implement this bill. 
The operative date for this bill is three months after the adjournment of the legislature.